EP1369829 - Electronic value data communication method and system between IC cards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | For all designated states Sakamura, Ken 4-9-2 Osaki, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | For all designated states Koshizuka, Noboru 2-27-20, Nishikubo Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/50] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
For all designated states Sakamura, Ken 4-9-2 Osaki, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | |||
For all designated states Koshizuka, Noboru 2-27-20, Nishikubo Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-0013 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishii, Kazuhiko, Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo, Inc., Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagata- cho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
Mori, Kensaku, Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo, Inc., Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagata- cho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
Aono, Hiroshi, Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo, Inc., Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagata- cho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 04 /
Hongo, Sadayuki, Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo, Inc., Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagata- cho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 05 /
Sakamura, Ken, Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo, Inc., Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagata- cho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 06 /
Koshizuka, Noboru, Intellectual Property Dept. NTT DoCoMo, Inc., Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagata- cho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2003/50] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | Bockhorni & Kollegen Elsenheimerstrasse 49 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/30] | Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Elsenheimerstrasse 49 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/31] | GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Elsenheimerstrasse 49 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/50] | Bockhorni, Josef, et al Patent-& Rechtsanwälte, Grosse, Bockhorni, Schumacher, Forstenrieder Allee 59 81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03012737.7 | 04.06.2003 | [2003/50] | Priority number, date | JP20020164808 | 05.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002164808 | [2003/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1369829 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1369829 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10 | [2003/50] | CPC: |
G06Q20/223 (EP,US);
G06F15/00 (KR);
G06Q20/322 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40975 (EP,US);
G07F7/1008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/44] |
Former [2003/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur elektronischen Wertdatenkommunikation zwischen Chipkarten | [2003/50] | English: | Electronic value data communication method and system between IC cards | [2003/50] | French: | Méthode et système de communication de données électroniques de valeur entre cartes à puce | [2003/50] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 15.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/25] | 04.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4320387 (POWELL WILLIAM S); | [Y]WO8303018 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * page 12, line 1 - page 15, line 10 *; | [A]US4454414 (BENTON WILLIAM M [US]); | [A]EP0172670 (TECHNION RES & DEV FOUNDATION [IL]); | [Y]US4625276 (BENTON WILLIAM M [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * column A; figures 1-5; claim - * * column 31, line 35 - line 64 *; | [Y]WO9116691 (JONHIG LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * page 13, line 13 - page 15, line 2 *; | [Y]EP0588339 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * column 9, line 57 - column 13, line 23 *; | [PA]EP1282087 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) |