EP1374915 - Method for germ reduction of impression materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/01] | Method for sterilisation and/or germ reduction of impression materials | ||
[2010/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heraeus Kulzer GmbH Grüner Weg 11 63450 Hanau / DE | [2005/41] |
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states Heraeus Kulzer GmbH Heraeusstrasse 12 - 14 63450 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Heraeus Kulzer GmbH & Co.KG Grüner Weg 11 63450 Hanau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grunwald, Martin, Dr. Im Dammfeld 14 50259 Pulheim / DE | 02 /
Esser, Birgit Am Klostereck 40 41515 Grevenbroich / DE | 03 /
Weber, Norbert St.-Tönnis-Strasse 142 50769 Köln / DE | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Kühn, Hans-Christian Heraeus Holding GmbH Stabsstelle Schutzrechte Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Kühn, Hans-Christian Heraeus Holding GmbH, Stabsstelle Schutzrechte, Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 03012768.2 | 05.06.2003 | [2004/01] | Priority number, date | DE2002128421 | 25.06.2002 Original published format: DE 10228421 | [2004/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1374915 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1374915 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/08, A61K6/10 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
A61L2/087 (EP,US);
A61K6/90 (EP,US);
A61L2/081 (EP,US);
A61L2202/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Keimreduktion von Abformmaterialien | [2010/49] | English: | Method for germ reduction of impression materials | [2010/49] | French: | Procédé de réduction de germes des matériaux d'empreinte dentaires ou médicales | [2010/49] |
Former [2004/01] | Verfahren zur Sterilisation und/oder Keimreduktion von Abformmaterialien | ||
Former [2004/01] | Method for sterilisation and/or germ reduction of impression materials | ||
Former [2004/01] | Procédé de stérilisation et/ou de réduction de germes des matériaux d'empreinte dentaires ou médicales | Examination procedure | 11.06.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 21.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.11.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.04.2011 | CZ | 27.04.2011 | DK | 27.04.2011 | EE | 27.04.2011 | FI | 27.04.2011 | HU | 27.04.2011 | IE | 27.04.2011 | NL | 27.04.2011 | RO | 27.04.2011 | SE | 27.04.2011 | SI | 27.04.2011 | SK | 27.04.2011 | TR | 27.04.2011 | AT | 05.06.2011 | LU | 05.06.2011 | BE | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | BG | 27.07.2011 | GR | 28.07.2011 | PT | 29.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
TR | 27.04.2011 | ||
AT | 05.06.2011 | ||
LU | 05.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
AT | 05.06.2011 | ||
LU | 05.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
AT | 05.06.2011 | ||
LU | 05.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
AT | 05.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
AT | 05.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 29.08.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]JPS5213234B ; | [A]EP0164190 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [A] 8-10* the whole document *; | [Y]EP0265776 (DENTSPLY GMBH [DE]) [Y] 4,5 * the whole document *; | [XDY]US5540876 (LARSON PETER M [US], et al) [XD] 1,8,11-15 * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 3 * [Y] 2-7; | [A]DE19719438 (THERA GES FUER PATENTE [DE]) [A] 1-3 * page 18, line 34 - line 37; claim 1 *; | [YD]WO0007546 (RHODIA CHIMIE SA [FR], et al) [YD] 2,3,6,7 * page 1, line 4 - line 16 * * page 6, line 18 - page 7, line 29 * * page 8, line 11 - line 13 *; | [XD] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1975-26486W, XP002252986 & JPS5213234B B2 19770413 (T HIRASAWA) [XD] 1,2,11 * abstract * | by applicant | DE1745810 | JPS5213234 | US4033774 | EP0173085 | DE3741575 | DE3724243 | DE3838587 | EP0269819 | JPH07112910 | US5540876 | WO9915132 | WO0007546 | - F.M. BLAIR; R.W. WASSELL, BRITISH DENTAL JOUMAL, (1996), vol. 180, no. 10, page 369 FF | - G.L. ADABO ET AL., JOURNAL OF PROSTHETIC DENTISTRY, (1999), vol. 81, no. 5, page 621 FF | - J. SETZ; U. BENZING, DEUTSCHE ZAHNäRTZLICHE ZEITSCHRIFT, (1989), vol. 44, page 106 F | - Y. XIA; G.M. WHITESIDES, ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (1998), vol. 37, pages 550 - 576 | - E. DELAMARCHE ET AL., ADV. MATER., (1997), vol. 9, pages 741 - 746 | - H. SCHMID; B. MICHEL, MACROMOLECULES, (2000), vol. 33, pages 3042 - 3049 | - D.N. FIRTELL; D.J. MOORE; G.B. PELLEU JR., JOURNAL OF PROSTHETIC DENTISTRY, (1972), pages 419 - 422 | - TH. KAUS; A. SETHI, ZWR, (2001), vol. 110, pages 22 - 26 | - D.J.T. HILL ET AL., MACROMOL. SYM., (2000), vol. 156, pages 95 - 102 | - W. NOLL, Chemie und Technologie der Silicone, VERLAG CHEMIE, (1968), page 199 F | - W. NOLL, Chemie und Technologie der Silicone, VERLAG CHEMIE, (1968), page 199 | - G.G. DELIDEST, RADIAT. PHYS. CHEM., (1980), vol. 16, pages 345 - 352 | - W. NOLL, Chemie und Technologie der Silicone, VERLAG CHEMIE, (1968), page 407 |