EP1388794 - A system and method for whiteboard and audio capture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/12] |
Former [2004/07] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhang, Zhengyou 10090 177th Ave NE Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 02 /
Cutler, Ross 16031 277th PL NE Duvall, WA 98019 / US | 03 /
He, Li-Wei 4221 W. Lake Sammamish Parkway NE Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 04 /
Gupta, Anoop 19908 NE 129th Street Woodinville, WA 98072 / US | 05 /
Liu, Zicheng 14743 SE 63rd Street Bellevue, WA 98006 / US | [2004/07] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/07] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03012896.1 | 06.06.2003 | [2004/07] | Priority number, date | US20020178443 | 19.06.2002 Original published format: US 178443 | [2004/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1388794 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1388794 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/10, G11B27/10, G11B27/28, G11B27/34, H04N5/77, H04N9/806, G06F17/30 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
G11B27/34 (EP,US);
H04N7/14 (KR);
G06F16/739 (EP,US);
G06Q10/1095 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/28 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/08] | G06F17/30, H04N7/15 | ||
Former IPC [2004/07] | G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/07] | Title | German: | Ein System und Verfahren zur Erfassung eines Whiteboards und von Audio | [2019/04] | English: | A system and method for whiteboard and audio capture | [2004/07] | French: | Un système et procédé pour la saisie d'audio et de tableau blanc | [2004/07] |
Former [2004/07] | Ein System und Verfahren zur weissen Tafel und Audioerfassung | Examination procedure | 04.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/21] | 17.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/40] | 17.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 17   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5550966 (DRAKE SAMUEL [US], et al) [I] 1-51 * abstract * * column 1, line 9 - line 15 * * column 1, line 30 - line 59 * * column 2, line 15 - line 43 * * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 2 * * column 3, line 40 - line 58 * * column 4, line 39 - line 65 * * column 5, line 19 - line 53 * * column 6, line 14 - line 54 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US6148304 (DE VRIES PIERRE [US], et al) [A] 1-51 * abstract * * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 2 * * column 3, line 19 - line 34 * * column 3, line 47 - line 55 * * column 5, line 27 - line 39 *; | [A]WO0161633 (SIEMENS TECH TO BUSINESS CT [US], et al) [A] 1-51 * abstract * * page 5, line 1 - line 28 * * page 13, line 4 - line 18 * * page 14, line 1 - line 2 * * page 14, line 23 - page 15, line 21 * * figure 1 *; | [I] - Patrick Chiu ET AL, "Meeting Capture in a Media Enriched Conference Room", CoBuild'99, (1999), URL: http://www.fxpal.com/publications/FXPAL-PR-99-118.pdf, (20120103), XP055015620 [I] 1-51 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/10705432_8 | [A] - ABOWD G D, "CLASSROOM 2000: AN EXPERIMENT WITH THE INSTRUMENTATION OF A LIVING EDUCATIONAL ENVIRONMENT", IBM SYSTEMS JOURNAL, IBM CORP. ARMONK, NEW YORK, US, (19990101), vol. 38, no. 4, ISSN 0018-8670, pages 508 - 530, XP000935341 [A] 1-51 * page 508 - page 516 * | by applicant | US5550966 |