EP1438912 - A goods container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aldi Einkauf GmbH & Co. oHG Burgstrasse 37 45476 Mülheim/Ruhr / DE | [2006/34] |
Former [2004/30] | For all designated states Aldi Einkauf GmbH & Co.oHG Burgstrasse 37 45476 Mühlheim/Ruhr / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | 02 /
* * * | [2006/34] |
Former [2004/30] | 01 /
* * * | ||
02 /
* * * | Representative(s) | Nunnenkamp, Jörg, et al Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Nunnenkamp, Jörg, et al Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte P.O. Box 10 02 54 45002 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2004/30] | Nunnenkamp, Jörg, Dr., et al Patentanwälte, Andrejewski,Honke & Sozien, Postfach 10 02 54 45127 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03012985.2 | 07.06.2003 | [2004/30] | Priority number, date | DE20022020141U | 27.12.2002 Original published format: DE 20220141 U | [2004/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1438912 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1438912 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A47F3/00, E05B43/00, E05C19/16 | [2004/30] | CPC: |
E05B43/005 (EP);
A47F3/002 (EP);
E05B2047/0094 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/30] | Title | German: | Warenbehälter | [2004/30] | English: | A goods container | [2004/30] | French: | Conteneur pour marchandises | [2004/30] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 10.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | EE | 23.08.2006 | FI | 23.08.2006 | FR | 23.08.2006 | NL | 23.08.2006 | TR | 23.08.2006 | BG | 23.11.2006 | DK | 23.11.2006 | SE | 23.11.2006 | ES | 04.12.2006 | PT | 25.01.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2008/52] | EE | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
FR | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | EE | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
FR | 11.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | FI | 23.08.2006 | |
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
FR | 11.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | FI | 23.08.2006 | |
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | FI | 23.08.2006 | |
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 23.08.2006 | |
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 23.08.2006 | |
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 23.08.2006 | |
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | FI | 23.08.2006 | |
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4191433 (RAMPP EGON [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]US4763937 (SITTNICK JR RALPH A [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]FR2672482 (BROT [FR]) [A] 1-13* abstract *; | [A]US5141271 (GERINGER ARTHUR [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * | by applicant | US4141610 | EP1090570 | DE10103756 |