EP1484376 - Solvent adhesive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ube Industries, Ltd. 1978-96, O-Aza Kogushi Ube-Shi, Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | For all designated states OSAKA GAS CO., LTD. 4-1-2, Hiranomachi, Chuo-ku,Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0046 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states Ube Industries, Ltd. 1978-96, O-Aza Kogushi Ube-Shi, Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | ||
For all designated states Osaka Gas Co., Ltd. 4-1-2, Hiranomachi, Chuo-ku,Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0046 / JP | |||
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states Ube Industries, Ltd. 1978-96, O-Aza Kogushi Ube-Shi, Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Higuchi, Yuji, c/o Osaka Gas Co., Ltd. 4-1-2, Hiranomahi, Chuo-ku Osaka 541-0046 / JP | 02 /
Isobe, Noriyuki, Ube Industries, Ltd. 1978-96, O-Aza Kogushi Ube-shi, Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | 03 /
Fujimura, Hideki, Ube Industries, Ltd. 1978-96, O-Aza Kogushi Ube-shi, Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | 04 /
Matsuda, Shinya, Ube Industries, Ltd. 1978-96, O-Aza Kogushi Ube-shi, Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03013065.2 | 02.10.2001 | [2004/50] | Priority number, date | JP20000306463 | 05.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000306463 | [2004/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1484376 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1484376 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C09J5/00, C08J5/12, C09J177/02 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
C08J5/122 (EP,US);
C08J5/125 (EP,US);
C09J177/00 (EP,US);
C09J177/02 (EP,US);
C09J177/06 (EP,US);
C09J5/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2004/50] | Title | German: | Lösemittelklebstoff | [2004/50] | English: | Solvent adhesive | [2004/50] | French: | Adhésif solvant | [2004/50] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2003 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 24.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/07] | 20.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/07] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01123683.3 / EP1195419 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1137077 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1-4 * claims 1,3-5 * * example - *; | [DX]WO9005756 (AUSTRALIAN GAS LIGHT CO [AU], et al) [DX] 1-4* claims 14,16,22,23 * |