EP1375674 - Method of detecting nucleic acids using probes with fluorescent labels by analysis of the fluorescence melting curves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOSOH CORPORATION 4560, Kaisei-cho Shunan-shi Yamaguchi-ken 746-8501 / JP | [2007/20] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Tosoh Corporation 4560, Kaisei-cho Shunan-shi Yamaguchi-ken 746-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Itoh, Shun-ichi Room 407, 23-4, Asahi-cho Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Hayashi, Toshinori Room 107, 23-4, Asahi-cho Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Saitoh, Juichi 2-20-16-I-101, Sakuramori Yamato-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Ishiguro, Takahiko 490-17, Kishine-cho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/01] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03013424.1 | 20.06.2003 | [2004/01] | Priority number, date | JP20020181573 | 21.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002181573 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1375674 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1375674 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6816 (EP,US);
C12Q1/686 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6816, C12Q2565/107, C12Q2527/107 (EP,US);
C12Q1/686, C12Q2565/107, C12Q2527/107 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/39] |
Former [2004/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Nachweis von Nukleinsäuren mit Fluoreszenzfarbstoff-markierten Sonden welches auf der Analyse von Schmelzkurven basiert | [2006/49] | English: | Method of detecting nucleic acids using probes with fluorescent labels by analysis of the fluorescence melting curves | [2004/01] | French: | Procédé de détection d'acides nucléiques utilisant des sondes avec des marqueurs fluorescents au moyen de courbes de dénaturation thermique | [2004/01] |
Former [2004/01] | Verfahren zum nachweis von Nukleinsäuren mit Fluoreszenzlabelnmakierten Sonden welches auf der Analyse von Schmelzkurven basiert | Examination procedure | 10.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 02.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2750504 (APPLIGENE ONCOR [FR]) [A] * claims 1,2 *; | [XY]WO0018965 (UNIV UTAH RES FOUND [US]) [X] 1-3 * figures 17,18; claims 1,6 * [Y] 4,5; | [A]WO0148237 (HOEFT ANDREAS [DE], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [XY]WO0214555 (UNIV UTAH RES FOUND [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * figures 5A,5B; example 9 * [Y] 4,5; | [Y] - TAYA T ET AL, "HOMOGENEOUS DETECTION OF A TARGET NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCE BY COMBINATION OF THE INTERCALATION ACTIVATING FLUORESCENCE DNA PROBE AND THE ISOTHERMAL SEQUENCE AMPLIFICATION", NUCLEIC ACIDS SYMPOSIUM SERIES, IRL PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (1999), vol. 42, ISSN 0261-3166, pages 51 - 52, XP001135170 [Y] 4,5 * the whole document * | [A] - RIRIE K M ET AL, "PRODUCT DIFFERENTIATION BY ANALYSIS OF DNA MELTING CURVES DURING THE POLYMERASE CHAIN REACTION", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, CA, US, (1997), vol. 245, no. 2, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 154 - 160, XP001015991 [A] * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.1996.9916 | Examination | EP1275734 | - ISHIGURO ET AL., "Fluorescence detection of specific sequence of nucleic acids by oxazole yellow-linked oligonucleotides. Homogeneous quantitative monitoring of in vitro transcription.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 24, no. 24, pages 4992 - 4997 |