EP1352969 - A method and a device for quantifying a substrate in a sample liquid using a biosensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikeda, Shin 2-5-16-205, Fujigao Katano-shi, Osaka-fu 576-0022 / JP | 02 /
Yoshioka, Toshihiko 15-15-307, Takatsuka-cho Hirakata-shi, Osaka-fu 573-0035 / JP | 03 /
Nankai, Shiro 4-50-12, Nasuzukuri Hirakata-shi, Osaka / JP | [2004/03] |
Former [2003/42] | 01 /
Ikeda, Shin 6-4-307, Myokenzaka Katano-shi, Osaka / JP | ||
02 /
Yoshioka, Toshihiko 4-15-11, Shinmori, Asahi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | |||
03 /
Nankai, Shiro 4-50-12, Nasuzukuri Hirakata-shi, Osaka / JP | Representative(s) | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Avenue du Pailly 25 1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH | ||
Former [2003/42] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 03013425.8 | 10.07.1995 | [2003/42] | Priority number, date | JP19950058939 | 17.03.1995 Original published format: JP 5893995 | [2003/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1352969 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1352969 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/00, G01N27/327 | [2003/42] | CPC: |
C12Q1/005 (EP,US);
C12Q1/001 (EP,US);
Y10S435/817 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Quantifizierung eines Substrats in einer flüssigen Probe mit einem Biosensor | [2003/42] | English: | A method and a device for quantifying a substrate in a sample liquid using a biosensor | [2003/42] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de quantification d'un substrat dans un échantillon liquide avec un capteur biologique | [2003/42] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/42] | 30.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.11.2007 | 29.10.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.11.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95110746.5 / EP0732406 | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 17.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 19.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0359831 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,8 * figure 4 *; | [A]EP0502504 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,8 * figure 6 *; | [A]DE4115795 (EKF IND ELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,8* the whole document *; | [A]EP0537761 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,8 * the whole document * |