EP1428985 - Gas turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.08.2006 [2006/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 16-5, Konan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wakazono, Susumu, c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd. Takasago Machinery Works, 1-1 Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome, Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Ishizaka, Kouichi, c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Takasago Research&Development Center, 1-1 Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome, Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Yuri, Masanori, c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Ltd Takasago Machinery Works, 1-1 Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome, Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 04 /
Takahashi, Ronald, c/o Mitsubishi Power Systems Inc 9100 South Dadeland Blvd., Suite 1600 Miami, Florida 33156 / US | [2004/25] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03013639.4 | 16.06.2003 | [2004/25] | Priority number, date | US20020314212 | 09.12.2002 Original published format: US 314212 | [2004/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1428985 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/16 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
F01D25/162 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2005/10] |
Former [2004/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gasturbine | [2004/25] | English: | Gas turbine | [2004/25] | French: | Turbine à gaz | [2004/25] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2003 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 20.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/34] | 07.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB685939 (ROLLS ROYCE) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 36 - line 39 * * page 1, line 46 - line 60; figure - *; | [X]GB744920 (ROLLS ROYCE) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 48 - line 57 * * page 3, line 9 - line 13; figure - *; | [X]GB866555 (BRISTOL SIDDELEY ENGINES LTD) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 12 - line 13 * * page 2, line 1 - line 6 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB1179009 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 3, line 47 - line 51 * * page 4, line 69 - line 70 * * page 1, line 49 - line 53 * * figures 1,4,5 *; | [X]GB1222902 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 79 - line 84; figure - *; | [X]US3909156 (STAHL WILLIAM F) [X] 1,2* column 1, line 31 - line 35; figure - *; | [X]US4044555 (MCLOUGHLIN WILLIAM G, et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 41 - line 43 * * claims 1,5-7 * * figures 1,2 * |