EP1375306 - Roof module for automobile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Webasto AG Kraillinger Strasse 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE | [2005/17] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Webasto Vehicle Systems International GmbH Kraillinger Strasse 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cocaign, Jean-Guy 28 Rue du Lac 49280 La Tessoualle / FR | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2005/17] |
Former [2004/01] | Bedenbecker, Markus Untertaxetweg 88 82131 Gauting / DE | Application number, filing date | 03013846.5 | 18.06.2003 | [2004/01] | Priority number, date | FR20020007689 | 21.06.2002 Original published format: FR 0207689 | [2004/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1375306 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1375306 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/06, B62D65/00 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
B62D25/06 (EP,US);
B60J7/0015 (EP,US);
B60J7/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2004/39] |
Former [2004/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dachmodul für Kraftfahrzeug | [2004/01] | English: | Roof module for automobile | [2004/01] | French: | Module de toit pour véhicule automobile | [2004/01] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 02.07.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.10.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.12.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 21.12.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.01.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.08.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19956567 (WEBASTO VEHICLE SYS INT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2 * figure 9 ** column 4, line 24 - column 4, line 31 *; | [A]EP1153820 (WEBASTO VEHICLE SYS INT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2 * figures 2,4 * * column 3, paragraph 16 - column 4, paragraph 18 *; | [A]US6331065 (WILMS BERND [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 5 *; | [X]US2002021029 (BOHM HORST [DE], et al) [X] 1,4-6 * figures 1,2,4; claims 1,2,8 * * page 2, paragraph 19 - page 2, paragraph 24 * |