EP1377088 - System and method for distributing content and computer program thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.2017 [2017/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2016/21] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yahagi, Masahiko c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2016/21] |
Former [2004/01] | 01 /
Yahagi, Masahiko NEC Corp., 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/21] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/26] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/01] | Glawe. Delfs. Moll Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03014270.7 | 25.06.2003 | [2004/01] | Priority number, date | JP20020185419 | 26.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002185419 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1377088 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1377088 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | [2006/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1377088 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/00, // H04L1/18, H04W12/06, H04L12/18 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
H04W12/069 (EP,US);
H04W72/30 (EP,US);
H04L1/18 (EP,US);
H04L12/1868 (EP,US);
H04L2001/0093 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/22] | H04Q7/22, H04L12/28, H04L12/18 | ||
Former IPC [2004/01] | H04Q7/22, H04L12/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2016/21] |
Former [2007/06] | DE, GB | ||
Former [2004/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Verteilung von Inhalten sowie entsprechendes Computerprogramm | [2004/01] | English: | System and method for distributing content and computer program thereof | [2004/01] | French: | Système et procédé de distribution de contenu et logiciel d'ordinateur correspondant | [2004/01] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 16.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0741468 (YAMAHA CORP [JP]) [Y] 17 * column 1, line 5 - line 23 ** column 2, line 34 - line 55 *; | [XAY]US2001055356 (DAVIES ROBERT J [GB]) [X] 1,13 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0029] * [A] 14,15,19,21 [Y] 17 | by applicant | EP0741468 | US2001055356 |