EP1348460 - Creating an aerosolized formulation of insulin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARADIGM CORPORATION 3929 Point Eden Way Hayward, CA 94545 / US | [2003/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lloyd, Lester J. 7 Haciendas Road Orinda, CA 94563 / US | 02 /
Lloyd, Peter M. 6239 Elderberry Drive Oakland, CA 94611 / US | 03 /
Rubsamen, Reid M. 102 El Camino Real Berkeley, CA 94705 / US | 04 /
Schuster, Jeffrey A. 5 El Portal Court Berkeley, CA 94708 / US | [2003/40] | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/40] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03014365.5 | 27.10.1995 | [2003/40] | Priority number, date | US19940331056 | 28.10.1994 Original published format: US 331056 | [2003/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1348460 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1348460 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | [2003/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/02, A61L9/04, C12Q1/00, A61K38/00, C07K5/00, C07K7/00, A61K9/00, A61K38/28 | [2003/43] | CPC: |
A61M15/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/28 (EP,US);
A61K9/007 (EP,US);
A61K9/0073 (EP,US);
A61K9/008 (EP,US);
A61M11/001 (EP,US);
A61M15/0031 (EP,US);
A61M15/0051 (EP,US);
A61M15/0055 (EP,US);
A61M15/0066 (EP,US);
A61M15/008 (EP,US);
A61M16/142 (EP,US);
A61J7/0418 (EP,US);
A61J7/0427 (EP,US);
A61J7/0445 (EP,US);
A61M15/0085 (EP,US);
A61M15/009 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0021 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/40] | A61M15/00, A61K9/72, A61K38/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/29] |
Former [2003/40] | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI | Title | German: | Herstellung einer Aerosolformulierung von Insulin | [2003/40] | English: | Creating an aerosolized formulation of insulin | [2003/40] | French: | Création d' une formulation à base d' insuline en aérosol | [2003/40] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 23.04.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, ES, IT | 08.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/33] | 15.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/33] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95940534.1 / EP0785713 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.05.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2255918 (DMW [GB]) [A] 1-10 * claim - ** figure - *; | [A]WO9317728 (ASTRA AB [SE]) [A] 1-10 * claim - * * figures 3A,3B,3C,5-7 *; | [A]WO9411044 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-10 * claim - * * page 11, line 14 * * figures 28,31-35 * |