EP1380971 - Program, apparatus and system for supporting planning of vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/03] | Program, method, apparatus and system for supporting planning of vehicle | ||
[2008/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2009/32] |
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noma, Kohji Mazda Motor Corporation, 3-1 Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Teruhisa Mazda Motor Corporation, 3-1 Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 03 /
Sakamoto, Toshinori Mazda Motor Corporation, 3-1 Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 04 /
Fujinaka, Mitsuru Mazda Motor Corporation, 3-1 Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 05 /
Fushimi, Akira Mazda Motor Corporation, 3-1 Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 06 /
Mizuma, Takashi Mazda Motor Corporation, 3-1 Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 07 /
Takemura, Jun Mazda Motor Corporation, 3-1 Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2004/03] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/03] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03014437.2 | 30.06.2003 | [2004/03] | Priority number, date | JP20020201706 | 10.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002201706 | [2004/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1380971 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1380971 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/50 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
G06T19/00 (EP,US);
G06F30/15 (EP,US);
G06F2111/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2004/41] |
Former [2004/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Programm, Vorrichtung und System zur Unterstützung der Fahrzeugplanung | [2008/11] | English: | Program, apparatus and system for supporting planning of vehicle | [2008/11] | French: | Logiciel, dispositif and système d'aide à la planification d'un véhicule | [2008/11] |
Former [2004/03] | Programm, Methode, Vorrichtung und System zur Unterstützung der Fahrzeugplanung | ||
Former [2004/03] | Program, method, apparatus and system for supporting planning of vehicle | ||
Former [2004/03] | Logiciel, procédé, dispositif and système d'aide à la planification d'un véhicule | Examination procedure | 18.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 12.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0401900 (VOLVO CAR BV [NL]) [A] 1-32* abstract *; | [A]US5761063 (JANNETTE DANIEL A [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * column 1, lines 49-61 * * column 2, lines 35-44 * * column 10, lines 1-11 * * figure 11 *; | [X]US6113643 (WEBER WILLIAM FRANCIS [US], et al) [X] 1-7,11-32 * column 4, line 60 - column 6, line 37 * * column 7, line 18 - line 28 * * column 8, line 19 - line 24 * * column 8, line 62 - line 67 * * column 13, line 62 - column 14, line 9 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB2369467 (FORD GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-32 * page 13, lines 5-10 * * page 13, line 33 - page 14, line 34 *; | [A] - GOMES DE SA A ET AL, "Virtual reality as a tool for verification of assembly and maintenance processes", COMPUTERS AND GRAPHICS, PERGAMON PRESS LTD. OXFORD, GB, (19990601), vol. 23, no. 3, ISSN 0097-8493, pages 389 - 403, XP004236359 [A] 1-32 * page 401, column 1, paragraphs 4-7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0097-8493(99)00047-3 |