EP1378294 - Powder coating installation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Göttling, Manfred Rheinstrasse 38 42697 Solingen / DE | [2004/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/02] | Representative(s) | Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Kölner Strasse 8 42651 Solingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/02] | Patentanwälte Lippert, Stachow, Schmidt & Partner Kölner Strasse 8 42651 Solingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03014684.9 | 27.06.2003 | [2004/02] | Priority number, date | DE2002130595 | 06.07.2002 Original published format: DE 10230595 | [2004/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1378294 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1378294 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B05B15/04, B05B15/12 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
B05B14/465 (EP);
B05B14/48 (EP);
B05B16/20 (EP);
B05B16/90 (EP);
B05B12/14 (EP);
B05B16/40 (EP);
Y02P70/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2008/24] |
Former [2004/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Pulverbeschichtungsanlage | [2004/02] | English: | Powder coating installation | [2004/02] | French: | Installation de revêtement par poudrage | [2004/02] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/28] | 06.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.11.2006 | 30.06.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE4030608 (GRONBACH WILFRIED [DE]) [Y] 1-8,10 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 42; figure . *; | [Y]US5288324 (SHANEYFELT JACK L [US]) [Y] 1-8,10 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 64 * * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 37 * * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 51 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE19722773 (GOETTLING MANFRED [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1038591 (GOETTLING MANFRED [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document * | by applicant | US5288324 | DE19722773 |