|
17.08.2017 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Opposition |
15 |
|
07.08.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.07.2017 |
F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.05.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
24.05.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.05.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
11.05.2017 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.05.2017 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2017 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.02.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.02.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.02.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.02.2017 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.01.2017 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2016 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2015 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.10.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Annex |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Opposition |
26 |
|
06.08.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.06.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.06.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2014 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2014 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.05.2014 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Opposition |
8 |
|
15.05.2014 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Opposition |
33 |
|
13.05.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Opposition |
33 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Opposition |
24 |
|
26.03.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.03.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2014 |
Processing of an appeal |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2013 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2013 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
38 |
|
26.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
54 |
|
26.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
26.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.10.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.10.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
17 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.10.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
08.10.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.09.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.05.2013 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.05.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2013 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
07.02.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.01.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.09.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
30 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
28.06.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.06.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
27 |
|
28.06.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
28.06.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.06.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
09.09.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.2010 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.08.2010 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
25.04.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.04.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.04.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2007 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2007 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2007 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2007 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2003 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2003 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2003 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2003 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2003 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2003 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2003 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
03.07.2003 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.07.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
03.07.2003 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2003 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
03.07.2003 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2003 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
27.06.2003 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2003 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.06.2003 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
24 |