EP1494364 - Device for controlling audio data output [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harman Becker Automotive Systems GmbH Becker-Göring-Strasse 16 76307 Karlsbad / DE | [2018/16] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Harman Becker Automotive Systems GmbH Becker-Goering-Strasse 16 76307 Karlsbad / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brülle-Drews, Christian Max-Herz-Ring 235 22159 Hamburg / DE | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/16] |
Former [2005/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03014856.3 | 30.06.2003 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1494364 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1494364 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/20 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
H04R5/04 (EP,US);
H04B1/207 (EP,US);
H04R2420/01 (EP,US);
H04R2420/03 (EP,US);
H04R2499/13 (EP,US);
H04R25/43 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/16] |
Former [2005/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Audiodaten-Ausgangskontrolle | [2005/01] | English: | Device for controlling audio data output | [2005/01] | French: | Circuit pour le contrôle de la sortie des données audio | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 05.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.06.2008 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 22.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2003 | AT | 18.04.2018 | CY | 18.04.2018 | CZ | 18.04.2018 | DK | 18.04.2018 | EE | 18.04.2018 | ES | 18.04.2018 | FI | 18.04.2018 | IT | 18.04.2018 | MC | 18.04.2018 | NL | 18.04.2018 | RO | 18.04.2018 | SE | 18.04.2018 | SI | 18.04.2018 | SK | 18.04.2018 | TR | 18.04.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | CH | 30.06.2018 | FR | 30.06.2018 | IE | 30.06.2018 | LI | 30.06.2018 | LU | 30.06.2018 | BG | 18.07.2018 | GR | 19.07.2018 | PT | 20.08.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 30.06.2003 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
IE | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
LU | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
IE | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
LU | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
IE | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
LU | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
IE | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
LU | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
IE | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
LU | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
IE | 30.06.2018 | ||
LU | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
LU | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 18.04.2018 | |
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | ES | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 18.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4435845 (TIMM HORST [DE], et al) [X] 1-24 * column 1 - column 10; figure 2 *; | [X]US5661811 (HUEMANN JAMES JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1-24 * figure 2; claims 1-11 *; | [X]DE10057261 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-24 * page 1 - page 5; figure 5 *; | [X]US2003103634 (ITO TSUYOSHI [JP]) [X] 1-24* column 4 - column 6; figures 3,4 * |