EP1360924 - Applicator device for carrying on the back [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ECOLAB INC. Ecolab Center 370 North Wabasha Street St. Paul, MN 55102-2233 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states ECOLAB INC. Ecolab Center 370 North Wabasha Street St. Paul MN 55102-2233 / US | ||
Former [2007/32] | For all designated states ECOLAB INC. 370 Wabasha Street N St. Paul, MN 55102-1390 / US | ||
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states Ecolab Inc. 370 Wabasha Street N St. Paul, MN 55102-1390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fernschild, Hans-Leo Luise-Hensel-Strasse 4 41352 Korschenbroich / DE | 02 /
Faubel, Heiko Erlenweg 2 42929 Wermelskirchen / DE | 03 /
Rogmann, Karl-Heinz Ratiborer Strasse 41 40880 Ratingen / DE | 04 /
Scheuvens, Ulrike Niermannsweg 31 40699 Erkrath / DE | [2004/06] |
Former [2004/01] | 01 /
Fernschild, Hans-Leo Luise-Hensel-Strasse 4 41352 Korschenbroich / DE | ||
02 /
Faubel, Heiko Erlenweg 2 42929 Wermelskirchen / DE | |||
03 /
Rogmann, Karl-Heinz Ratiborer Strasse 41 40880 Ratingen / DE | |||
04 /
Lenz, Ulrike Geschwister-Scholl-Strasse 1 40764 Langenfeld / DE | |||
Former [2003/46] | 01 /
Fernschild, Hans-Leo Luise-Hensel-Strasse 4 41352 Korschenbroich / DE | ||
02 /
Faubel, Heiko Löh 32 42929 Wermelskirchen / DE | |||
03 /
Rogmann, Karl-Heinz Ratiborer Strasse 41 40880 Ratingen / DE | |||
04 /
Lenz, Ulrike Geschwister-Scholl-Strasse 1 40764 Langenfeld / DE | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2003/46] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03014976.9 | 03.03.2000 | [2003/46] | Priority number, date | DE19991011131 | 12.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19911131 | [2003/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1360924 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1360924 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | [2004/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1360924 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A47L13/22 | [2003/46] | CPC: |
A47L13/30 (EP,US);
A46B11/063 (EP,US);
A46B17/02 (EP,US);
A47L13/22 (EP,US);
A46B2200/302 (EP,US);
A46B2200/3033 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/46] | Title | German: | Rucksack-Auftragegerät | [2003/46] | English: | Applicator device for carrying on the back | [2003/46] | French: | Dispositif applicateur se transportant sur le dos | [2003/46] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/05] | 28.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00912541.0 / EP1161173 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.08.2007 | DK | 08.08.2007 | FI | 08.08.2007 | IE | 08.08.2007 | NL | 08.08.2007 | SE | 08.11.2007 | GR | 09.11.2007 | ES | 19.11.2007 | PT | 08.01.2008 | AT | 03.03.2008 | LU | 03.03.2008 | BE | 31.03.2008 | CH | 31.03.2008 | LI | 31.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | [2010/32] |
Former [2009/40] | CY | 08.08.2007 | |
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
AT | 03.03.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
CH | 31.03.2008 | ||
LI | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 08.08.2007 | |
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
CH | 31.03.2008 | ||
LI | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | DK | 08.08.2007 | |
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
CH | 31.03.2008 | ||
LI | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 08.08.2007 | |
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | DK | 08.08.2007 | |
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | DK | 08.08.2007 | |
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | DK | 08.08.2007 | |
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | DK | 08.08.2007 | |
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 08.08.2007 | |
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 08.08.2007 | |
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 19.11.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2083039 (SEARLS EDWARD M) [A] 3,4,8 * Seite 1, linke Spalte, Zeilen 1-3 * * Seite 1, linke Spalte, Zeilen 33-46 * * Seite 1, rechte Spalte, Zeilen 34 - 55 * * Seite 2, linke Spalte, Zeilen 1-14, 41-60, 65-75 * * Seite 2, rechte Spalte, Zeilen 1-23 ** figure 1 *; | [DA]US4152084 (LORCH GLENN G [US], et al) [DA] 1,2,5,7,10 * column 2, line 30 - line 68 * * column 3, line 1 - line 43 * * column 4, line 64 - line 68 * * column 5, line 1 - line 18 * * figure - *; | [A]GB2178303 (PUTT RONALD ARTHUR) [A] 1,4,8 * Seite 1, Zeilen 38-43, 50-57, 66-94 * * Seite 2, Zeilen 15-53, 83-93 * * page 3, line 16 - line 55 * * figures 1,2A-2D *; | [YA]US4848660 (O'CONNELL MARK E [US]) [Y] 2,7,9 * Spalte 1, Zeilen 5-8, 61-68 * * Spalte 2, Zeilen 1-7, 28-37 * * figure -; claim 1 * [A] 5; | [YA]DE3905760 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [Y] 2,6 * column 3, line 27 - line 42 * * column 3, line 55 - line 68 * * column 4, line 1 - line 28 * * figures 1,4-6 * [A] 5; | [Y]FR2639818 (ROCHEX [FR]) [Y] 6 * page 2, line 16 - line 32 * * page 3, line 3 - line 14 * * page 4, line 5 - page 6, line 12 * * figure -; claims 1,4-6 *; | [XY]US4971471 (SLOAN DAVID B [US]) [X] 1,10 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 2 * * column 3, line 20 - line 25 * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 2 * * Spalte 4, Zeilen 15-18, 24-36 * * figure -; claims 11,15-19 * [Y] 2-4,6-9; | [Y]DE19707467 (FICHTNER KARL HEINZ [DE]) [Y] 3,4,8 * column 2, line 12 - line 32 * * figure 2; claims 1,2,5,6 * |