EP1383216 - Under floor installation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tehalit GmbH Seebergstrasse 37 67716 Heltersberg / DE | [2005/02] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Tehalit GmbH Seebergsrasse 37 67716 Heltersberg / DE | ||
Former [2004/04] | For all designated states Tehalit GmbH & Co. KG Seebergstrasse 37 67716 Heltersberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schnurr, Richard Rehbergstrasse 12 66957 Vinningen / DE | 02 /
Kauf, Peter Fahrenbergstrasse 17 66482 Zweibrücken / DE | 03 /
Klöckner, Olivier Erlenring 20 66976 Rodalben / DE | 04 /
Michel, Dieter Wielandtsrasse 2 66459 Kirkel / DE | [2004/04] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Dr. Keller, Schwertfeger Partnerschaft mbB Westring 17 76829 Landau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/04] | Patentanwälte Möll und Bitterich Westring 17 76829 Landau / DE | Application number, filing date | 03014992.6 | 02.07.2003 | [2004/04] | Priority number, date | DE2002210774U | 17.07.2002 Original published format: DE 20210774 U | [2004/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1383216 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1383216 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/38 | [2004/04] | CPC: |
H02G3/383 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/04] | Title | German: | Unterflurinstallation | [2004/04] | English: | Under floor installation | [2004/04] | French: | Installation souterraine | [2004/04] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 28.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.02.2008 | EE | 27.02.2008 | RO | 27.02.2008 | SI | 27.02.2008 | SK | 27.02.2008 | TR | 27.02.2008 | BG | 27.05.2008 | HU | 28.08.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | CY | 27.02.2008 | |
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
HU | 28.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 27.02.2008 | |
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | EE | 27.02.2008 | |
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | EE | 27.02.2008 | |
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | RO | 27.02.2008 | |
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 27.02.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3734733 (DOMOTEC AG [CH]) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0529740 (SCHMIDT REUTER [DE]) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19534458 (RIEPE JOHANNES [DE]) [A] 1,8,9* the whole document *; | [A]DE20102443U (UPONOR INNOVATION AB [SE]) [A] 1-3,6 * the whole document * |