EP1380525 - Device for positioning a cart for loading or unloading a web roll, like printed material for rotary printers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2010 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states manroland AG Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach/Main / DE | [2009/40] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states manroland AG Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | ||
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nimbs, Michael Hauptstrasse 46 08539 Leibnitz / DE | 02 /
Gsell, Thomas Wilhelm-Bauer-Strasse 32 1/2 89407 Dillingen / DE | [2004/03] | Representative(s) | Ulrich, Thomas, et al manroland AG Intellectual Property (IP) 86219 Augsburg / DE | [2008/30] |
Former [2007/19] | Ulrich, Thomas, et al MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Intellectual Property (IP) 86219 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2004/03] | Schober, Stefan, Dipl.-Ing. MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG, Postfach 10 00 96 86135 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03015049.4 | 03.07.2003 | [2004/03] | Priority number, date | DE2002131521 | 12.07.2002 Original published format: DE 10231521 | [2004/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1380525 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1380525 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | [2005/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1380525 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65H19/12 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
B65H19/126 (EP,US);
B65H2405/312 (EP,US);
B65H2405/422 (EP,US);
B65H2511/23 (EP,US);
B65H2553/51 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/23, B65H2220/01, B65H2220/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FI, FR, LI [2005/40] |
Former [2004/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Positionieren eines Schlittens zum Be- oder Entladen einer Wickelrolle, wie Bedruckstoffbahnen für Rollenrotationsdruckmaschinen | [2004/03] | English: | Device for positioning a cart for loading or unloading a web roll, like printed material for rotary printers | [2004/03] | French: | Dispositif pour positionner un chariot pour charger ou décharger une rouleau de bande, comme du matériau imprimé pour des imprimantes rotatives | [2004/03] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 20.07.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.11.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.09.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4586673 (TOKUNO MASATERU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 56 - line 64 * * column 3, line 56 - line 65; figures 4,5 *; | [A]WO8908598 (CAMS SRL [IT]) [A] 1* figures 3,5; claims 6,7 *; | [DA]DE4334582 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [DA] * the whole document *; | [A]EP0849201 (KOENIG & BAUER ALBERT AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 3 * * column 3, line 29 - line 42 * |