EP1400273 - Filter insert [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2008 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Freudenberg KG Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2007/49] |
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states Carl Freudenberg KG Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Felber, Uwe Birkenweg 10 69518 Abtsteinach / DE | 02 /
Häfner, Uwe Grundelbachstrasse 112c 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2004/13] | Application number, filing date | 03015051.0 | 03.07.2003 | [2004/13] | Priority number, date | DE2002144309 | 23.09.2002 Original published format: DE 10244309 | [2004/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1400273 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1400273 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/52 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
B01D46/521 (EP);
B01D46/0005 (EP);
B01D46/10 (EP);
B01D46/103 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/13] | Title | German: | Filtereinsatz | [2004/13] | English: | Filter insert | [2004/13] | French: | Élément de filtration | [2007/23] |
Former [2004/13] | Element de filtre | Examination procedure | 11.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 01.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.12.2007 | CZ | 05.12.2007 | DK | 05.12.2007 | EE | 05.12.2007 | FI | 05.12.2007 | GB | 05.12.2007 | IE | 05.12.2007 | NL | 05.12.2007 | RO | 05.12.2007 | SI | 05.12.2007 | SK | 05.12.2007 | TR | 05.12.2007 | BG | 05.03.2008 | SE | 05.03.2008 | GR | 06.03.2008 | ES | 16.03.2008 | PT | 05.05.2008 | HU | 06.06.2008 | AT | 03.07.2008 | LU | 03.07.2008 | BE | 31.07.2008 | CH | 31.07.2008 | IT | 31.07.2008 | LI | 31.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 05.12.2007 | |
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
EE | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
GB | 05.12.2007 | ||
IE | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
TR | 05.12.2007 | ||
BG | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
HU | 06.06.2008 | ||
AT | 03.07.2008 | ||
LU | 03.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 05.12.2007 | |
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
EE | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
GB | 05.12.2007 | ||
IE | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
BG | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
HU | 06.06.2008 | ||
AT | 03.07.2008 | ||
LU | 03.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 05.12.2007 | |
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
EE | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
GB | 05.12.2007 | ||
IE | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
BG | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
AT | 03.07.2008 | ||
LU | 03.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/50] | CY | 05.12.2007 | |
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
EE | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
GB | 05.12.2007 | ||
IE | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
BG | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
AT | 03.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 05.12.2007 | |
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
EE | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
GB | 05.12.2007 | ||
IE | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
BG | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | CZ | 05.12.2007 | |
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
EE | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
GB | 05.12.2007 | ||
IE | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
BG | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 05.12.2007 | |
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
EE | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
GB | 05.12.2007 | ||
IE | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
BG | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 05.12.2007 | |
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
EE | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
GB | 05.12.2007 | ||
IE | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | CZ | 05.12.2007 | |
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
GB | 05.12.2007 | ||
IE | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 05.12.2007 | |
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
GB | 05.12.2007 | ||
IE | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/03] | CZ | 05.12.2007 | |
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
GB | 05.12.2007 | ||
IE | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | CZ | 05.12.2007 | |
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
IE | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | CZ | 05.12.2007 | |
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | CZ | 05.12.2007 | |
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 05.12.2007 | |
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | CZ | 05.12.2007 | |
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | FI | 05.12.2007 | |
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | FI | 05.12.2007 | |
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE4202769 (KNECHT FILTERWERKE GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1* figures 1,3; claim 1 *; | [AD]EP0649335 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [AD] 1 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0810352 (PALL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * figure 2; claims 1,9 *; | [A]US5902361 (POMPLUN KLAUS [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 3; claim 1 * |