EP1349044 - System for controlling the distribution and use of digital works using digital tickets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. 103 Foulk Road, Suite 205-M Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/40] | For all designated states ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. 103 Foulk Road, Suite 205-M Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stefik, Mark, L. 55 Big Tree Way Woodside, California 94062 / US | 02 /
Pirolli, Peter, L. 44 Wildwood Place El Cerrito, California 94530 / US | [2003/40] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/40] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03015127.8 | 23.11.1995 | [2003/40] | Priority number, date | US19940344760 | 23.11.1994 Original published format: US 344760 | [2003/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1349044 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1349044 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | [2004/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [2003/40] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0185 (EP,US);
A61B34/30 (US);
A61B34/37 (US);
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
G06Q10/101 (EP,US);
G06Q20/12 (EP,US);
G06Q20/1235 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3674 (EP,US);
G06Q30/00 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0283 (EP,US);
G06Q30/04 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0601 (EP,US);
G06Q50/184 (EP,US);
H04L12/14 (EP,US);
H04L12/1403 (EP,US);
H04L12/146 (EP,US);
H04L12/1485 (EP,US);
H04L12/1496 (EP,US);
H04L61/00 (EP,US);
H04L61/45 (EP,US);
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
H04L63/0442 (EP,US);
H04L63/0464 (EP,US);
H04L63/0807 (EP,US);
H04L63/0823 (EP,US);
H04L63/10 (EP,US);
H04L63/102 (EP,US);
H04L63/104 (EP,US);
H04L63/105 (EP,US);
H04L63/123 (EP,US);
H04L9/3213 (EP,US);
H04L9/3297 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04N21/23412 (EP,US);
H04N21/2541 (EP,US);
H04N21/2543 (EP,US);
H04N21/26613 (EP,US);
H04N21/4627 (EP,US);
H04N21/6332 (EP,US);
H04N21/6377 (EP,US);
H04N21/835 (EP,US);
H04N21/8355 (EP,US);
H04N21/83555 (EP,US);
H04N7/16 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0046 (US);
A61B2034/301 (US);
A61B2090/031 (US);
A61B2090/376 (US);
A61M25/0113 (US);
G06F2211/007 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2115 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2135 (EP,US);
H04L2209/56 (EP,US);
H04L2209/603 (EP,US);
H04L2463/101 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/40] | Title | German: | System zur Steuerung der Verteilung und Benutzung von Digitalwerken unter Verwendung von Digitalkarten | [2003/40] | English: | System for controlling the distribution and use of digital works using digital tickets | [2003/40] | French: | Système pour commander la distribution et l'utilisation d'oeuvres numériques utilisant des tickets numériques | [2003/40] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/40] | 10.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 03.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.01.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/09] | Appeal following examination | 26.09.2008 | Appeal received | 01.12.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 03.02.2009 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02028101.0 / EP1293860 | EP95308422.5 / EP0715247 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   05.01.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5224163 (GASSER MORRIE [US], et al) [X] 1-6,25-30 * column 5, line 41 - column 6, line 31 * * column 7, line 29 - line 35 * * column 8, line 19 - line 51 * * column 14, line 51 - column 15, line 39 * [Y] 7-9,12-22,31-33,36-46; | [YA]US5260999 (WYMAN ROBERT M [US]) [Y] 17-19,41-43 * column 7, line 3 - line 40 * * column 11, line 3 - column 12, line 53 * * column 15, line 18 - line 64 *[A] 10,11,23,24,34,35,47,48; | [X]US5299263 (BELLER MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 1,25 * column 2, line 26 - line 35 * * column 2, line 45 - line 54 * * column 10, line 14 - column 11, line 10 *; | [YA] - PERRITT H H, Knowbots, Permissions Headers and Contract Law, PROCEEDINGS TECHNOLOGICAL STRATEGIES FOR PROTECTING INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY IN THE NETWORKED MULTIMEDIA ENVIRONMENT, XX, XX, PAGE(S) 39-50, (19930402), XP002233403 [Y] 7-9,12-18,20-22,31-33,36-42,44-46 * page 1, paragraphs 1,2 * * page 2, paragraph 7 * * page 4, line 1 - page 6, line 23 * [A] 10,11,23,24,34,35,47,48 |