EP1349045 - System for controlling the distribution and use of digital works [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/40] | System for controlling the distribution and use of digital works using digital tickets | ||
[2007/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. 103 Foulk Road, Suite 205-M Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | [2008/21] |
Former [2003/40] | For all designated states ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. 103 Foulk Road, Suite 205-M Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stefik, Mark, J. 55 Big Tree Way Woodside, California 94062 / US | 02 /
Pirolli, Peter, L. 44 Wildwood Place El Cerrito, California 94530 / US | [2003/40] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/40] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03015128.6 | 23.11.1995 | [2003/40] | Priority number, date | US19940344760 | 23.11.1994 Original published format: US 344760 | [2003/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1349045 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1349045 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | [2004/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1349045 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/00 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0185 (EP,US);
A61B34/30 (US);
A61B34/37 (US);
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
G06Q10/101 (EP,US);
G06Q20/12 (EP,US);
G06Q20/1235 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3674 (EP,US);
G06Q30/00 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0283 (EP,US);
G06Q30/04 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0601 (EP,US);
G06Q50/184 (EP,US);
H04L12/14 (EP,US);
H04L12/1403 (EP,US);
H04L12/146 (EP,US);
H04L12/1485 (EP,US);
H04L12/1496 (EP,US);
H04L61/00 (EP,US);
H04L61/45 (EP,US);
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
H04L63/0442 (EP,US);
H04L63/0464 (EP,US);
H04L63/0807 (EP,US);
H04L63/0823 (EP,US);
H04L63/10 (EP,US);
H04L63/102 (EP,US);
H04L63/104 (EP,US);
H04L63/105 (EP,US);
H04L63/123 (EP,US);
H04L9/3213 (EP,US);
H04L9/3297 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04N21/23412 (EP,US);
H04N21/2541 (EP,US);
H04N21/2543 (EP,US);
H04N21/26613 (EP,US);
H04N21/4627 (EP,US);
H04N21/6332 (EP,US);
H04N21/6377 (EP,US);
H04N21/835 (EP,US);
H04N21/8355 (EP,US);
H04N21/83555 (EP,US);
H04N7/16 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0046 (US);
A61B2034/301 (US);
A61B2090/031 (US);
A61B2090/376 (US);
A61M25/0113 (US);
G06F2211/007 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2115 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2135 (EP,US);
H04L2209/56 (EP,US);
H04L2209/603 (EP,US);
H04L2463/101 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/40] | G06F1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/40] | Title | German: | System zur Steuerung der Verteilung und Benutzung von Digitalwerken | [2007/46] | English: | System for controlling the distribution and use of digital works | [2007/46] | French: | Système pour commander la distribution et l'utilisation d'oeuvres numériques | [2007/46] |
Former [2003/40] | System zur Steuerung der Verteilung und Benutzung von Digitalwerken unter Verwendung von Digitalkarten | ||
Former [2003/40] | System for controlling the distribution and use of digital works using digital tickets | ||
Former [2003/40] | Système pour commander la distribution et l'utilisation d'oeuvres numériques utilisant des tickets numériques | Examination procedure | 03.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/40] | 15.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M09) | 14.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.10.2007 | 05.10.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.10.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02028101.0 / EP1293860 | EP95308422.5 / EP0715247 | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4882752 (LINDMAN RICHARD S [US], et al) [Y] 7,31,32* column 4, line 32 - line 41 *; | [Y]EP0538216 (TELEVERKET [SE]) [Y] 12-14,54-56 * column 6, line 1 - column 7, line 16 *; | [XY]US5260999 (WYMAN ROBERT M [US]) [X] 1-5,8-11,17-27,29,30,33,35-53,59-72,74,76-78 * column 2, line 35 - line 46 * * column 5, line 28 - line 50 * * column 6, line 49 - column 7, line 33 * * column 8, line 4 - line 15 * * column 9, line 54 - line 60 * * column 11, line 3 - line 30 * * column 12, line 12 - line 53 * * column 14, line 62 - column 15, line 4 * * column 17, line 36 - line 46 * * column 21, line 62 - column 22, line 4 * * column 30, line 1 - line 48 * * column 32, line 37 - line 38 * * figures 2-4,8,17,18 * [Y] 7,31,32; | [XY] - PERRITT H H, "Knowbots, Permissions Headers and Contract Law", PROCEEDINGS TECHNOLOGICAL STRATEGIES FOR PROTECTING INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY IN THE NETWORKED MULTIMEDIA ENVIRONMENT, XX, XX, (19930402), pages 39 - 50, XP002233403 [X] 1-3,8,9,15-17,19-28,30,34,37,39-45,48,49,57-67,70-73,75,76 * page 1, paragraphs 1,2 * * page 2, paragraph 7 * * page 4, line 1 - page 7, line 20 * [Y] 12-14,54-56 |