EP1493762 - Resin and Ink for the Printing of Shrink Sleeves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siegwerk Benelux NV Rijksweg 10 2880 Bornem / BE | [2006/16] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states SICPA HOLDING S.A. Avenue de Florissant 41 1008 Prilly / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eugène, Denis 138 avenue de la Gare 74800 La Roche sur Foron / FR | 02 /
Eisele, Gilles Chez Mermier 74250 Fillinges / FR | 03 /
Catherin, Gilles Presbytêre, Rue de l'Eglise 25 01630 St. Genis Pouilly / FR | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Hepp, Dieter, et al Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Hepp, Dieter, et al Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG, Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | Application number, filing date | 03015170.8 | 04.07.2003 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1493762 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1493762 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/12, C08G18/40, C08G18/75 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
C08G18/12 (EP,US);
C08G18/222 (EP,US);
C08G18/6674 (EP,US);
C08L75/04 (EP,US);
C09D11/102 (EP,US);
C08K3/013 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1328 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/3234 (US,EP);
C08G18/12, C08G18/42 (EP,US);
C08L75/04, C08L91/06, C08L2666/54 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Title | German: | Harz und Tinte zum Bedrucken von schrumpfbaren Manschetten | [2005/01] | English: | Resin and Ink for the Printing of Shrink Sleeves | [2005/01] | French: | Résine et encre pour imprimer des manchons retractables | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 24.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.05.2007 | BE | 30.05.2007 | CH | 30.05.2007 | CY | 30.05.2007 | CZ | 30.05.2007 | DK | 30.05.2007 | EE | 30.05.2007 | FI | 30.05.2007 | LI | 30.05.2007 | NL | 30.05.2007 | RO | 30.05.2007 | SI | 30.05.2007 | SK | 30.05.2007 | TR | 30.05.2007 | IE | 04.07.2007 | LU | 04.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | BG | 30.08.2007 | SE | 30.08.2007 | GR | 31.08.2007 | PT | 30.10.2007 | HU | 01.12.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
CY | 30.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
EE | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
RO | 30.05.2007 | ||
SI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SK | 30.05.2007 | ||
IE | 04.07.2007 | ||
LU | 04.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 30.08.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
CY | 30.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
EE | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
RO | 30.05.2007 | ||
SI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SK | 30.05.2007 | ||
IE | 04.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 30.08.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
EE | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
RO | 30.05.2007 | ||
SI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SK | 30.05.2007 | ||
IE | 04.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 30.08.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
RO | 30.05.2007 | ||
SI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SK | 30.05.2007 | ||
IE | 04.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 30.08.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
RO | 30.05.2007 | ||
SI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SK | 30.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 30.08.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SK | 30.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 30.08.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SK | 30.05.2007 | ||
BG | 30.08.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SI | 30.05.2007 | ||
BG | 30.08.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SI | 30.05.2007 | ||
BG | 30.08.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CH | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0930349 (DAINICHISEIKA COLOR CHEM [JP]) [X] 22 * paragraph [0032]; examples 1-18 *; | [X]DE19816528 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-13 * page 4, lines 2-7 * * page 11, lines 43-53 *; | [X]WO0053429 (CRYOVAC INC [US], et al) [X] 22 * page 19, lines 1-8 * * page 20, lines 3-10 *; | [X]US6251988 (BLUM HARALD [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 4, lines 35-55; example 1 * * column 7, line 8 *; | [AD]WO0238643 (SUN CHEMICAL CORP [US]) [AD] 1-24 * example 2; claim 1 *; | [A]EP1229090 (SICPA HOLDING SA [CH]) [A] 1-24* claim 1 * |