EP1381074 - Method and apparatus for observing a semiconductor device using an electron microscope [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss NTS GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 56 73447 Oberkochen / DE | [2007/42] |
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states LEO Elektronenmikroskopie GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 56 73447 Oberkochen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kienzle, Oliver, Dr. Kiefernweg 18 73430 Aalen / DE | 02 /
Knippelmeyer, Rainer, Dr. Weisse Steige 32 73431 Aalen / DE | 03 /
Müller, Ingo, Dr. Kälblesrainweg 103 73430 Aalen / DE | [2004/03] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/03] | DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03015393.6 | 08.07.2003 | [2004/03] | Priority number, date | DE20021030929 | 09.07.2002 Original published format: DE 10230929 | [2004/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1381074 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1381074 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/28 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
H01J37/28 (EP,US);
H01L22/00 (KR);
H01J2237/2817 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CZ, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2008/21] |
Former [2004/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum elektronenmikroskopischen Beobachten einer Halbleiteranordnung | [2004/03] | English: | Method and apparatus for observing a semiconductor device using an electron microscope | [2004/03] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour l'observation d'un dispositif semiconducteur en microscopie électronique | [2004/03] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 13.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/46] | 27.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.01.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6087659 (ADLER DAVID L [US], et al) [Y] 9-11 * column A; figures 1-3 *; | [DXA]US6232787 (LO CHIWOEI WAYNE [US], et al) [DX] 1-5,13-15 * column 3, line 30 - column 8, line 53; figures 1,2,4 * [A] 18-20; | WO0175929 [ ] (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al); | [PXY]EP1271603 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-8,12-20 * paragraphs [0023] - [0036]; figures 1,4-6 * [PY] 9-11 | Examination | DE10000361 |