EP1385330 - Print quality measuring method and print quality measuring apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co., Ltd. 1-1, Tenjinkitamachi, Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome, Horikawa-dori, Kamikyo-ku Kyoto 602-8585 / JP | [2012/50] |
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co., Ltd. 1-1, Tenjinkitamachi, Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome, Horikawa-dori, Kamikyo-ku Kyoto 602-8585 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murakami, Shigeo, @Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co. Ltd. 1-1 Tenjinkitamachi Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome Horikawa-dori, Kamikyo-ku, Kyoto 602-8585 / JP | [2012/50] |
Former [2004/05] | 01 /
Murakami, Shigeo, Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co. Ltd. 1-1 Tenjinkitamachi, Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome Horikawa-dori, Kamikyo-ku, Kyoto 602-8585 / JP | Representative(s) | Kilian Kilian & Partner mbB Zielstattstraße 23a 81379 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Kilian Kilian & Partner Aidenbachstraße 54 81379 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/50] | Kilian, Helmut Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/05] | Kilian, Helmut, Dr. Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03015450.4 | 09.07.2003 | [2004/05] | Priority number, date | JP20020210872 | 19.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002210872 | [2004/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1385330 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1385330 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | [2007/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1385330 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/60 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
H04N1/6033 (EP,US);
B41F33/0036 (EP,US);
H04N1/00002 (EP,US);
H04N1/00023 (EP,US);
H04N1/00045 (EP,US);
H04N1/00055 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/44] |
Former [2004/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Messverfahren und -gerät für die Druckqualität | [2004/05] | English: | Print quality measuring method and print quality measuring apparatus | [2004/05] | French: | Méthode et appareil de mesure de la qualité d'impression | [2004/05] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 05.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 31.07.2013 | [2014/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0142470 (GRETAG AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,6,10,11,18,19,23,27,28 * pages 3-11 *; | [A]US5450165 (HENDERSON THOMAS A [US]) [A] 1,10,18,27* column 5, line 59 - column 8, line 46 *; | [X]EP0803356 (ADVANCED VISION TECHNOLOGY A V [IL]) [X] 1-4,6-13,15-21,23-30,32-34 * page 4, line 15 - page 8, line 19 *; | [X]US5774635 (KUUSISTO MATTI [FI], et al) [X] 1,2,6,10,11,18,19,23,27,28 * the whole document *; | [XA]US2001010191 (STEINBACHER EDUARD [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,10,11,18,19,23,27,28 * the whole document * [A] 7-9,15-17,24-26,32-34 | by applicant | JP2002205117 |