EP1380876 - Reflecting colour liquid crystal display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Yoshifumi Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki, 2-1 Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [2004/03] | Representative(s) | Vollnhals, Aurel TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Vollnhals, Aurel Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/03] | Vollnhals, Aurel Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner (GbR), TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03015462.9 | 09.07.2003 | [2004/03] | Priority number, date | JP20020203196 | 11.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002203196 | [2004/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1380876 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13357 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
G09G3/342 (EP,US);
G02F1/1335 (KR);
G02F1/133603 (EP,US);
G02F1/133621 (EP,US);
G09G3/3426 (EP,US);
G02F1/133514 (EP,US);
G02F1/133622 (EP,US);
G09G2310/024 (EP,US);
G09G3/3208 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, GB, NL [2004/41] |
Former [2004/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Reflektierende Farbflüssigkristallanzeige | [2004/03] | English: | Reflecting colour liquid crystal display | [2004/03] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage à cristaux liquides couleur du type réfléchissant | [2004/03] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/03] | 18.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/53] | 02.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/53] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4772885 (UEHARA KIYOHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,8 * column 3, line 46 - column 5, line 11 * * column 6, line 36 - line 53 * * column 7, line 12 - line 29 * * column 9, line 63 - column 10, line 6 * * figures 1-4,15-17 *; | [A]US6111560 (MAY PAUL [GB]) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 13 * * column 5, line 8 - column 6, line 26 * * column 7, line 13 - line 58 ** figures 1-3,5,6,8 *; | [X]US2002033908 (MORI YUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0021] - [0027] * * paragraphs [0055] - [0061] * * paragraphs [0030] , [0038] - [0050] * * paragraphs [0055] - [0061] * * figures 3-5 * * claims 1-4,6-8 * |