EP1413487 - Airbag protection device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW Automotive Safety Systems GmbH Hefner-Alteneck-Strasse 11 63743 Aschaffenburg / DE | [2004/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kreuzer, Martin Wendelinusweg 2 63839 Kleinwallstadt / DE | [2004/18] | Representative(s) | Kitzhofer, Thomas Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | Kitzhofer, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03015509.7 | 09.07.2003 | [2004/18] | Priority number, date | DE2002212337U | 09.08.2002 Original published format: DE 20212337 U | [2004/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1413487 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1413487 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/16 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
B60R21/239 (EP,US);
B60R21/203 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/03] |
Former [2004/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gassack-Schutzeinrichtung | [2004/18] | English: | Airbag protection device | [2004/18] | French: | Dispositif de protection à sac gonflable | [2004/18] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 29.10.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.02.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.12.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 01.03.2006 | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/39] | GB | 01.03.2006 | |
IT | 01.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | GB | 01.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06286570 ; | [A]GB2306409 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE]) [A] 1 * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 4, paragraph 3 ** page 8, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4; figures 4,5 *; | [A]EP0917995 (TRW AUTOMOTIVE SAFETY SYS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3,5 * column 3, paragraph 12 - column 4, paragraph 15; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1022198 (AERAZUR [FR]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, paragraph 15 - column 3, paragraph 23; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US6322099 (KEEBLE TIMOTHY E [US]) [A] 1,6 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 22; figures 1,2,5 *; | [A]WO0214115 (DALPHI METAL ESPANA SA [ES], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 1995, no. 01, & JP06286570 A 19941011 (HINO MOTORS LTD) [A] 1-3,5 * abstract * |