EP1496435 - Dependable microcontroller, method for designing a dependable microcontroller and computer program product therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2016 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yogitech Spa Via S. Antonio, 3 55049 Viareggio (Lucca) / IT | [2005/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mariani, Riccardo Via dei Guariganghi, 7 56100 Pisa / IT | 02 /
Motto, Silvano Via dei Partigiani, 26 55049 Viareggio (Lucca) / IT | 03 /
Chiavacci, Monia Via del Prato, 1 51020 Prataccio (Pistoia) / IT | [2005/02] | Representative(s) | Marchitelli, Mauro Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | Marchitelli, Mauro c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 03015860.4 | 11.07.2003 | [2005/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1496435 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/267 | [2005/02] | CPC: |
G06F11/27 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/02] | Extension states | AL | 06.07.2005 | LT | 06.07.2005 | LV | 06.07.2005 | MK | 06.07.2005 | Title | German: | Gesicherte Mikrokontroller, Verfahren zum Entwurf eines gesichertes Mikrokontrollers, und Computerprogrammprodukt dafür | [2005/02] | English: | Dependable microcontroller, method for designing a dependable microcontroller and computer program product therefor | [2005/02] | French: | Microcontrôleur dépendable, procédé de conception d'un microcontrôleur dépendable, et produit logiciel correspondant | [2005/02] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 22.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.05.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.09.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/40] | 06.10.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.10.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/40] | Appeal following examination | 03.12.2009 | Appeal received No. T0605/10 | 08.02.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.07.2014 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2014/30] | 21.11.2014 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2014/47] | 06.10.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 06.10.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.10.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 01.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 01.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6081864 (LOWE WILLIAM M [US], et al) [X] 27-31 * abstract * * column 1, lines 12-37 * * claim 4 *; | [XA]US6249893 (RAJSUMAN ROCHIT [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8 * figures 3,9 * * column 1, lines 6-11 * * column 4, line 32 - column 5, line 25 * * column 6, lines 46-50 * [A] 4,9-26; | [A]US6421790 (FRUEHLING TERRY L [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * figure 1 * * column 1, lines 26-59 * * column 4, line 11 - column 5, line 27 ** column 9, line 9 - column 10, line 55 *; | [X]US2003046666 (SIEBERT HARRY [DE], et al) [X] 1-26 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] * * paragraphs [0036] - [0056] *; | [A] - "SELECTIVE SOFTWARE UPDATE", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19900201), vol. 32, no. 9B, ISSN 0018-8689, page 86, XP000082244 [A] 1-31 * the whole document * |