EP1380838 - Method of gas analysis for determining the reaction of a biological system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | Change - representative | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gäbler, Ralph Gartenweg 2 86559 Adelzhausen / DE | [2004/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/03] | Representative(s) | Lenzing Gerber Stute PartG von Patentanwälten m.b.B. Bahnstrasse 9 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | Lenzing Gerber Stute Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten Bahnstrasse 9 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2008/37] | Stute, Ivo Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 200 221 40100 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2004/03] | Stute, Ivo, Dipl.-Ing. Alt-Niederkassel 75 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 03015878.6 | 11.07.2003 | [2004/03] | Priority number, date | DE2002131541 | 11.07.2002 Original published format: DE 10231541 | [2004/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1380838 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1380838 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | [2004/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/497, A61B5/08, A61K49/00 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
G01N33/497 (EP);
G01N33/4975 (EP);
G01N33/4977 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/03] | G01N33/497 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/21] |
Former [2004/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gasanalyseverfahren zur Bestimmung der Reaktion eines biologischen Systems | [2004/03] | English: | Method of gas analysis for determining the reaction of a biological system | [2004/03] | French: | Procédé d'analyse de gaz pour déterminer la réponse d'un système biologique | [2004/03] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/49] | 04.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.04.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.04.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9305709 (GUSTAFSSON LARS ERIK [SE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,9,13,15,17 * page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 2 * * page 15, line 24 - page 16, line 35; figure 3 *; | [A]WO9324835 (DUCOA LP [US]) [A] 14-17* page 3, line 32 - page 5, line 6; figure 1 *; | [X]US5789251 (ASTLE THOMAS W [US]) [X] 21-23 * abstract *; | [X]DE19719098 (PLATH CHRISTIAN DR MED [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,9,13,15,17 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0136969 (AEROCRINE AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,9,13,15,17 * page 5, line 12 - page 6, line 2 * * page 7, line 2 - line 8; figure 1 *; | [PX]DE10110838 (MLU HALLE WITTENBERG [DE], et al) [PX] 1 * the whole document *; | [X] - TUOMAINEN JAANA ET AL, Ozone induction of ethylene emission in tomato plants: Regulation by differential accumulation of transcripts for the biosynthetic enzymes, PLANT JOURNAL, VOL. 12, NR. 5, PAGE(S) 1151-1162, (199711), ISSN 0960-7412, XP002288052 [X] 1-3,5-7,9,13,19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-313X.1997.12051151.x | [X] - GROSSMANN KLAUS ET AL, Studies on the mechanism of selectivity of the auxin herbicide quinmerac, PESTICIDE SCIENCE, VOL. 52, NR. 2, PAGE(S) 111-118, (199802), ISSN 0031-613X, XP002288084 [X] 1-3,5-7,9,13,19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1096-9063(199802)52:2<111::AID-PS695>3.0.CO;2-# |