EP1355451 - Browser based command and control home network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetong-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-shi Kyungki-do Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO. LTD. 416 Maetong-dong, Paldal-gu, Suwon-shi Kyungki-do Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2003/43] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS Co. Ltd. 416 Maetong-dong, Paldal-gu, Suwon-shi Kyungki-do, Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Humpleman, Richard James 343 Lower Vinters Circle Freemont, CA 94539 / US | 02 /
Harms, Kevin G. 5790 Barnswell Way San Jose, CA 95138 / US | 03 /
Deacon, Michael S. 731 Colleen Drive San Jose, CA 95123 / US | 04 /
Wolff, Robert M. 40542 Blacow Road Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [2003/43] | Representative(s) | Clark, David James, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/08] | Clark, David James, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2003/43] | Brandon, Paul Laurence APPLEYARD LEES, 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 03015956.0 | 24.06.1998 | [2003/43] | Priority number, date | US19970050762P | 25.06.1997 Original published format: US 50762 P | US19970059499P | 22.09.1997 Original published format: US 59499 P | [2003/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1355451 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1355451 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | [2004/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1355451 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04L29/06, G06F9/445 | [2003/43] | CPC: |
H04L12/2803 (EP,US);
H04L67/51 (EP,US);
H04L12/2805 (EP,US);
H04L12/2809 (EP,US);
H04L12/281 (EP,US);
H04L12/2812 (EP,US);
H04L12/2814 (EP,US);
H04L12/2818 (EP,US);
H04L12/282 (EP,US);
H04L12/2832 (EP,US);
H04L12/462 (EP,US);
H04L12/66 (EP,US);
H04L41/12 (US);
H04L41/22 (EP,US);
H04L61/30 (EP,US);
H04L61/4541 (EP,US);
H04L61/5014 (EP,US);
H04L61/5038 (EP,US);
H04L67/01 (US);
H04L67/02 (EP,US);
H04L67/025 (EP,US);
H04L67/12 (EP,US);
H04L67/14 (EP,US);
H04L67/142 (EP,US);
H04L67/303 (EP,US);
H04L67/34 (EP,US);
H04L67/54 (EP,US);
H04L67/75 (EP,US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04N21/4108 (EP,US);
H04N21/4131 (EP,US);
H04N21/42204 (EP,US);
H04N21/43615 (EP,US);
H04N21/4381 (EP,US);
H04N21/44231 (EP,US);
H04N21/4438 (EP,US);
H04N21/4532 (EP,US);
H04N21/454 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP,US);
H04N21/4755 (EP,US);
H04N21/4782 (EP,US);
H04N21/482 (EP,US);
H04N21/4821 (EP,US);
H04N21/485 (EP,US);
H04N21/64322 (EP,US);
H04N5/765 (EP,US);
H04N7/106 (EP,US);
H04N7/163 (EP,US);
G08C2201/33 (EP,US);
H04L2012/2849 (EP,US);
H04L2012/285 (EP,US);
H04L2101/365 (EP,US);
H04L61/00 (EP,US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04L67/125 (EP,US);
H04L69/325 (EP,US);
H04N5/775 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99943 (US);
Y10S707/99945 (US);
Y10S715/97 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2003/43] | Title | German: | Auf Browser basiertes Steuerungs- und Kontrollheimnetzwerk | [2003/43] | English: | Browser based command and control home network | [2003/43] | French: | Réseau domotique de contrôle et commande basé sur navigateur | [2003/43] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/43] | 31.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.10.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98930986.9 / EP1015952 | Divisional application(s) | EP05009633.8 / EP1562328 | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5631652 (LEE SANG-SU [KR]) [X] 28-32* column 1, line 8 - column 4, line 14 *; | [X]WO9718636 (WEBTRONICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8,10,12,13,15,16,21-23,26,27 * page 1, line 4 - page 5, line 30 *; | [XAY] - LARSEN A K, "THE NEXT WEB WAVE: NETWORK MANAGEMENT", DATA COMMUNICATIONS, MCGRAW HILL. NEW YORK, US, (1996), vol. 25, no. 1, ISSN 0363-6399, pages 31 - 32,34, XP000545237 [X] 1-4,8,10,12,13,15,16,21-23,26,27 * page 31 * * page 32, column M, line 7 - column R, line 3 * * page 33, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 33, column M, paragraph L - column L, paragraph 2 * [A] 6,17,18,20 [Y] 5,7,9,11,14,19,24,25 | [X] - "JAVA PARKS DEVELOPER INTEREST FROM IS TO EMBEDDED SYSTEMS", COMPUTER DESIGN, PENNWELL PUBL. LITTLETON, MASSACHUSETTS, US, (19960501), vol. 35, no. 6, ISSN 0010-4566, pages 32 - 34,37, XP000593778 [X] 1-4,8,10,12,13,15,16,21-23,26,27 * page 32, line 1 - page 33, paragraph 3 * | [Y] - CORCORAN P M ET AL, "Browser And Applet Interfaces To Cebus Networks", IEEE, CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS ARTICLE, (19970611), pages 328 - 329, XP010250002 [Y] 5,7,14,19,24 * the whole document * | [Y] - LIGHT A ET AL, "Delivering Digital Video Over IEEE 1394", IEEE, CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS ARTICLE, (19970611), pages 334 - 335, XP010250105 [Y] 9,11,25 * abstract * * page 334, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 335, column L, paragraphs 1,2 * |