EP1352822 - Bicycle damping enhancement system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Specialized Bicycle Components, Inc. 15130 Concord Circle Morgan Hill, CA 95037 / US | [2007/24] |
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states Specialized Bicycle Components, Inc. 15130 Concord Circle Morgan Hill, CA 95037 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McAndrews, Michael 706 Roger Hill Road East Wallingford, VT 05742 / US | [2004/05] |
Former [2003/42] | 01 /
McAndrews, Michael 385 Beele Drive Santa Cruz, CA 95060 / US | Representative(s) | Wombwell, Francis, et al Forresters 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | Wombwell, Francis, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 03015960.2 | 04.04.2000 | [2003/42] | Priority number, date | US19990288003 | 06.04.1999 Original published format: US 288003 | [2003/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1352822 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1352822 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1352822 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B62K25/04, F16F9/504 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
B62K25/04 (EP,US);
B62K25/10 (US);
B62K25/286 (EP,US);
B62K3/02 (EP,US);
F16F9/096 (EP,US);
F16F9/504 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/42] | B62K25/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/42] | Title | German: | Dämpfungsverbesserungssystem für ein Fahrrad | [2003/42] | English: | Bicycle damping enhancement system | [2003/42] | French: | Système amortisseur amélioré pour bicyclette | [2003/42] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 21.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00921642.5 / EP1165362 | Divisional application(s) | EP07011284.2 / EP1829776 | EP07011289.1 / EP1829777 | EP07011419.4 / EP1829778 | EP07011421.0 / EP1834869 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.06.2007 | BE | 13.06.2007 | CH | 13.06.2007 | CY | 13.06.2007 | DK | 13.06.2007 | FI | 13.06.2007 | LI | 13.06.2007 | NL | 13.06.2007 | SE | 13.09.2007 | GR | 14.09.2007 | PT | 13.11.2007 | [2009/34] |
Former [2009/15] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CH | 13.06.2007 | |
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS59106734 ; | [A]US1492328 (LANG JAMES S) [A] 1,5,10,15,20 * figure .; claim - *; | [A]US4126302 (CURNUTT CHARLES R) [A] 1,5,10,15,20 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]DE4123643 (KLEINBREUER PETER [DE], et al) [A] 1-24 * figure -; claim - *; | [AP]WO9931403 (ROCKSHOX INC [US]) [AP] 1,5,10,15,20* figure -; claim - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841013), vol. 008, no. 224, Database accession no. (M - 331), & JP59106734 A 19840620 (KAYABA KOGYO KK) [A] 1,5,10,15,20 * abstract * | by applicant | US5509679 | US5678837 |