EP1398989 - Optical switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/12] | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sunaga, Takahiro, Yokohama Works Sumitomo Elec. Ind., Ltd., 1, Taya-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 244-8588 / JP | 02 /
Katayama, Makoto, Yokohama Works Sumitomo Elec. Ind., Ltd., 1, Taya-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 244-8588 / JP | 03 /
Kanie, Tomohiko, Yokohama Works Sumitomo Elec. Ind., Ltd., 1, Taya-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 244-8588 / JP | 04 /
Furukawa, Masato, Yokohama Works Sumitomo Elec. Ind., Ltd., 1, Taya-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 244-8588 / JP | 05 /
Shiozaki, Manabu, Yokohama Works Sumitomo Elec. Ind., Ltd., 1, Taya-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 244-8588 / JP | [2004/12] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/12] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03016533.6 | 23.07.2003 | [2004/12] | Priority number, date | JP20020264529 | 10.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002264529 | US20020411098P | 17.09.2002 Original published format: US 411098 P | [2004/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1398989 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1398989 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/00 | [2004/12] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0005 (EP);
H04Q2011/0026 (EP);
H04Q2011/0043 (EP);
H04Q2011/0083 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/12] |
Former [2004/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optischer Schalter | [2004/12] | English: | Optical switch | [2004/12] | French: | Commutateur optique | [2004/12] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 03.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/07] | 20.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6195478 (FOUQUET JULIE E [US]) [Y] 1-16 * figures 3-5 *; | [Y]US2001050928 (CAYREFOURCQ IAN [FR], et al) [Y] 1-16* figures 9,10 * |