EP1376733 - Cooling device for battery power source [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | |||
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-0826 / JP | |||
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0050 / JP | ||
For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-0826 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kouzo, Katsumi c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0050 / JP | 02 /
Marukawa, Shuuhei c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0050 / JP | 03 /
Kobayashi, Takaki c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0050 / JP | 04 /
Kakino, Manabu c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0050 / JP | 05 /
Etoh, Toyohiko c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-0826 / JP | 06 /
Fukao, Yasuyoshi c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-0826 / JP | 07 /
Kanamaru, Kunio c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-0826 / JP | 08 /
Watanabe, Koh c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-0826 / JP | 09 /
Inui, Kiwamu c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-0826 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | 01 /
Kouzo, Katsumi Matsushita Elec. Ind. Co., Ltd., 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0050 / JP | ||
02 /
Marukawa, Shuuhei Matsushita Elec. Ind. Co., Ltd., 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0050 / JP | |||
03 /
Kobayashi, Takaki Matsushita Elec. Ind. Co., Ltd., 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0050 / JP | |||
04 /
Kakino, Manabu Matsushita Elec. Ind. Co., Ltd., 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0050 / JP | |||
05 /
Etoh, Toyohiko Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-0826 / JP | |||
06 /
Fukao, Yasuyoshi Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-0826 / JP | |||
07 /
Kanamaru, Kunio Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-0826 / JP | |||
08 /
Watanabe, Koh Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-0826 / JP | |||
09 /
Inui, Kiwamu Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-0826 / JP | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Haley, Stephen, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2007/07] | Haley, Stephen, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2007/04] | Finnie, Peter John, et al Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2004/01] | Rackham, Stephen Neil GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03016665.6 | 20.03.1998 | [2004/01] | Priority number, date | JP19970069956 | 24.03.1997 Original published format: JP 6995697 | JP19970069957 | 24.03.1997 Original published format: JP 6995797 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1376733 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1376733 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/10, H01M2/20, H01M10/6563, H01M10/6556, H01M10/652, H01M10/6557, H01M10/6566, H01M10/613, // H01M10/625, H01M10/643 | [2018/18] | CPC: |
H01M10/6563 (EP);
H01M50/227 (EP,US);
H01M10/613 (EP);
H01M10/652 (EP);
H01M10/6556 (EP);
H01M10/6557 (EP);
H01M10/6566 (EP);
H01M50/213 (EP,US);
H01M50/505 (EP,US);
H01M50/51 (EP,US);
H01M50/516 (EP,US);
H01M50/569 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/01] | H01M10/50 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/01] | Title | German: | Kühlvorrichtung für Batterie Energiequelle | [2004/01] | English: | Cooling device for battery power source | [2004/01] | French: | Appareil de refroidissement pour source d'alimentation à piles | [2004/01] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 14.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/12] | 31.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/12] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98302116.3 / EP0892450 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980302116) is 21.02.2003 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 12.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 03.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 22.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2027978 (DEUTSCHE AUTOMOBILGESELLSCH) [A] 1-8 * claims 1-12 *; | [A]US5015545 (BROOKS ALEC N [US]) [A] 1-8 * claims 1-20 *; | [A]US5204609 (ALISAUSKI DARYL J [US]) [A] 1-8 * claims 1-3 *; | [A]DE4326943 (VARTA BATTERIE [DE]) [A] 1-8* claims 1-3 *; | [X]US5585204 (OSHIDA KEI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * figure 12; claims 1-35 * | by applicant | US5585204 |