EP1386845 - Easily prepared box with pocket for illustrative leaflet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2007 [2007/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GI.BI.EFFE SRL Via Simone d'Orsenigo, 5 20035 Milano / IT | [2006/16] |
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states GI.BI.EFFE S.r.l. Via Washington, 17 I-20146 Milan (MI) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lo Duca, Carmelo Via Val di Sole, 11 20141 Milano / IT | [2004/06] | Representative(s) | Frignoli, Luigi, et al Giambrocono & C. S.p.A., Via Rosolino Pilo, 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | Frignoli, Luigi, et al Ing. A. Giambrocono & C. S.r.l. Via Rosolino Pilo, 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03016777.9 | 23.07.2003 | [2004/06] | Priority number, date | IT2002MI01766 | 02.08.2002 Original published format: IT MI20021766 | [2004/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1386845 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/42 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
B65D5/4266 (EP,US);
B65D5/4237 (EP,US);
B31B50/20 (EP,US);
B31B50/22 (EP,US);
B31B50/25 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/06] | Title | German: | Leicht auszurichtende Schachtel mit Tasche für einen Beipackzettel | [2004/06] | English: | Easily prepared box with pocket for illustrative leaflet | [2004/06] | French: | Boîte à compartiment pour une notice informative facile à mettre en forme | [2004/06] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/12] | 24.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/24] | 11.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2249520 (CORRUPLAST LTD [GB]) [A] * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 2, paragraph 3 *; | [Y]US5273206 (VASSILIOU EUSTATHIOS [US]) [Y] 2,3,5 * column 1, line 41 - line 44 * * column 6, line 3 - line 48 *; | [XDY]EP1219542 (GI BI EFFE SRL [IT]) [XD] 1,6 * paragraphs [0018] , [0022]; figures 1,2,8 * [Y] 2,3,5 | by applicant | US3147856 | DE3208777 | DE8618368U | GB2277077 | EP0911266 | WO0020289 | EP1219542 |