EP1387541 - Reduction of peak to average power ratio [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2011 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Itahara, Hiroshi 832-2-502, Tokaichiba-cho, Midori-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 226-0025 / JP | 02 /
Hagiwara, Yuichi 3-2-10-309, Kamiookanishi, Konan-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 233-0002 / JP | [2004/06] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03016801.7 | 23.07.2003 | [2004/06] | Priority number, date | JP20020224221 | 31.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002224221 | [2004/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1387541 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1387541 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | [2007/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1387541 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
H04L27/2614 (EP,US);
H04L27/2623 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/42] |
Former [2004/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verringerung des Verhältnisses von Spitzen- zu Durchschnittsleistung | [2004/06] | English: | Reduction of peak to average power ratio | [2004/06] | French: | Réduction du rapport de puissance de crête à puissance moyenne | [2010/01] |
Former [2004/06] | Réduction du rapport de pouvoir de crête à pouvoir moyen | Examination procedure | 19.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 31.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10164098.5 / EP2219334 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0735731 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]) [A] 1-4* the whole document *; | [X]EP0993136 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0067] * * figures 2,6 *; | [A]US2001000456 (MCGOWAN NEIL N [CA]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0007] * * claims 1,2,6,7,14 * * figures 4a,6 * |