EP1385216 - Semiconductor light emitting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYODA GOSEI CO., LTD. 1, Aza-Nagahata, Oaza Ochiai, Haruhi-cho Nishi-Kasugai-gun Aichi-ken, 452-8564 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd. 1, Aza-Nagahata, Oaza Ochiai, Haruhi-cho Nishikasugai-gun, Aichi-ken, 452-8564 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uemura, Toshiya, c/o Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd. 1, Aza Nagahata, Oaza Ochiai, Haruhi-cho Nishikasugai-gun, Aichi-ken, 452-8564 / JP | [2004/05] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/05] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03016882.7 | 24.07.2003 | [2004/05] | Priority number, date | JP20020217334 | 25.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002217334 | JP20030158401 | 03.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003158401 | [2004/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1385216 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
H01L33/507 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49107 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3025 (EP,US);
H01L33/508 (EP,US);
H01L33/58 (EP,US);
H01L33/60 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/3025, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Licht emittierende Halbleitervorrichtung | [2004/05] | English: | Semiconductor light emitting device | [2004/05] | French: | Dispositif semiconducteur à luminescence | [2004/05] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 29.05.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |