EP1395047 - Television receiver apparatus with a controllable circuit arrangement for the reproduction of a picture in picture display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2007 [2007/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Loewe Opta GmbH Industriestrasse 11 96317 Kronach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states LOEWE OPTA GmbH Industriestrasse 11 96317 Kronach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Heinrich, Ing. grad. Eichenbühl 71 96352 Wilhelmsthal / DE | [2004/10] | Application number, filing date | 03016931.2 | 25.07.2003 | [2004/10] | Priority number, date | DE2002138452 | 22.08.2002 Original published format: DE 10238452 | [2004/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1395047 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1395047 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/45 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
H04N5/45 (EP);
H04N21/4221 (EP);
H04N21/4316 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/10] | Title | German: | Fernsehempfangsgerät mit einer steuerbaren Schaltungsanordnung zur Wiedergabe einer Bild-im-Bild-Darstellung | [2004/10] | English: | Television receiver apparatus with a controllable circuit arrangement for the reproduction of a picture in picture display | [2004/10] | French: | Récepteur de télévision avec un agencement de circuit contrôlable pour la reproduction d'un affichage à image incrustée | [2004/10] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 10.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/13] | 07.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DYA]EP0366001 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US]) [DY] 1 * column 4, line 2 - column 6, line 37 * [A] 2-11; | [YA]EP0651570 (EDICO SRL [IT]) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 4 * [A] 2-11; | [A]EP1161086 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1-11* paragraphs [0060] , [0061] *; | [DA]DE10115709 (LOEWE OPTA GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-11 * paragraphs [0008] , [0012] - [0024] * |