EP1387458 - Cable transition with flexible protective sheath [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Link GmbH Bahnhofstrasse 59-61 35510 Butzbach-Ostheim / DE | [2004/37] |
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states Elektro-Special-Bedarf Link GmbH Bahnhofstrasse 59-61 35510 Butzbach-Ostheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Link, Daniel Butzbacher Strasse 37 35510 Butzbach / DE | [2004/06] | Representative(s) | Rentzsch, Heinz Leo-Grewenig-Strasse 11 64625 Bensheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | Rentzsch, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Schönbornring 1 63263 Neu-Isenburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03016946.0 | 25.07.2003 | [2004/06] | Priority number, date | DE2002134413 | 29.07.2002 Original published format: DE 10234413 | DE2003208584U | 02.06.2003 Original published format: DE 20308584 U | [2004/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1387458 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1387458 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | [2005/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1387458 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02G11/00 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
H02G11/00 (EP);
H02G3/0468 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/40] |
Former [2004/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kabelübergang mit flexiblem Schutzmantel | [2004/06] | English: | Cable transition with flexible protective sheath | [2004/06] | French: | Transition de câble à gaine protectrice flexible | [2004/06] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 20.07.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.08.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/39] | IT | 30.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3105311 (WAERTSILAE OY AB [FI]); | [AD]DE29814952U (ELEKTRO SPECIAL BEDARF NORBERT [DE]) [AD] 1,6,7 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE20015428U (ELEKTRO SPECIAL BEDARF LINK GM [DE]); | [AD]EP1202403 (ELEKTRO SPECIAL BEDARF LINK GM [DE]) |