EP1387481 - Micromachined moving device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2010 | Change - representative | published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Aviation Electronics Industry, Limited 21-2, Dogenzaka 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0043 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states JAPAN AVIATION ELECTRONICS INDUSTRY, LIMITED 21-2, Dogenzaka 1-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 150-0043 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Yoshichika, Japan Aviation Electronics Industry Limited, 21-2, Dogenzaka 1-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 150-0043 / JP | [2004/06] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/10] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/06] | Hoffmann, Eckart, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Bahnhofstrasse 103 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | Application number, filing date | 03017140.9 | 29.07.2003 | [2004/06] | Priority number, date | JP20020221405 | 30.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002221405 | [2004/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1387481 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02N1/00 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
H02N1/006 (EP,US);
G02B26/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2004/44] |
Former [2004/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mikromekanisch hergestellte Bewegungsvorrichtung | [2004/06] | English: | Micromachined moving device | [2004/06] | French: | Dispositif de deplacement micro-usiné | [2004/06] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 01.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/30] | 06.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2001264650 ; | [A]JPH09163761 ; | [X]US6140737 (BOIE ROBERT A [US]) [X] 1,5 * abstract * * column 1, line 17 - line 58 * * column 3, line 3 - line 37; claim 8 *; | [XAY]EP1125357 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [X] 1,5 * figures 1-6 * * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] - [0011] , [0012] , [0017] - [0019] * [A] 6 [Y] 2-4; | [A]US2002074896 (KASAHARA AKIHIRO [JP]) [A] 2-4 * abstract ** paragraphs [0076] , [0077] * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020701), vol. 2000, no. 26, & JP2001264650 A 20010926 (JAPAN AVIATION ELECTRONICS INDUSTRY LTD) [Y] 2-4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, & JP09163761 A 19970620 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 2-4 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2001264650 |