EP1502942 - Solid softener composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.07.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant International Ltd. Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/05] | For all designated states Clariant International Ltd. Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Galotti, Manlio 1420 apto 101 Sao Paulo, CEP 01421-001 / BR | 02 /
Nunes, Geoerge Italo Pitombeira Av. Fagundes Filho, 789 apto. 55 Sao Paulo, CEP 04304-011 / BR | 03 /
Kume, Gustavo Haruki R. Iquirim 125 Apto. 04-v Sao Paulo, CEP 05586-000 / BR | [2005/05] | Representative(s) | Paczkowski, Marcus, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent Management Industriepark Höchst, G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/05] | Paczkowski, Marcus, Dr., et al Clariant Service GmbH Patente, Marken, Lizenzen Am Unisys-Park 1 65843 Sulzbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 03017171.4 | 29.07.2003 | [2005/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1502942 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/00, C11D1/835, C11D3/22, C11D3/12, C11D11/00 | [2005/05] | CPC: |
C11D11/0082 (EP,US);
C11D1/835 (EP,US);
C11D17/0034 (EP,US);
C11D3/001 (EP,US);
C11D1/62 (EP,US);
C11D1/72 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/05] | Title | German: | Feste Weichspülerzusammensetzung | [2005/05] | English: | Solid softener composition | [2005/05] | French: | Composition adoucissante solide | [2005/05] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/39] | 11.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/32] | 23.03.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4294711 (HARDY FREDERICK E, et al) [A] 1,4,5,9,11,13-19* column 10, line 49 - column 11, line 53; example 1 *; | [X]DE4405930 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-9,15,17-19 * page 3, line 49 - line 58 * * page 4, line 40 - line 43; example -; claim - *; | [A]EP0881279 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-7,15,17-19 * page 4, line 9 - line 25; examples 9,11; claims 1-8; table 3 * |