EP1357133 - Use of powdery, crosslinked polymers which absorb aqueous liquids and blood [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/44] | Powdery, crosslinked polymers which absorb aqueous liquids and blood, method for production thereof and their use | ||
[2018/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2019/09] |
Former [2012/42] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Strasse 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states Stockhausen GmbH Bäkerpfad 25 47805 Krefeld / DE | ||
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states STOCKHAUSEN GmbH & Co. KG Bäkerpfad 25 47805 Krefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mertens, Richard, Dr. Dahlerdyk 116a 47803 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
Harren, Jörg, Dr. An der Heimstätte 1 47807 Krefeld / DE | [2003/44] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/26] |
Former [2003/44] | Herzog, Martin, et al Kahlhöfer . Neumann . Herzog . Fiesser, Karlstrasse 76 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 03017172.2 | 26.02.2000 | [2003/44] | Priority number, date | DE19991009838 | 05.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19909838 | [2003/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1357133 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1357133 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | [2003/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1357133 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/00, A61L15/00, B01J20/26, A61L15/60, C08J3/24, C08F8/14 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
C08F8/00 (EP,US);
A61L15/60 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/26 (EP,US);
B01J20/261 (EP,US);
B01J20/267 (EP,US);
C08F8/14 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L15/60, A61L15/20 (EP,US);
C08F8/00, C08F20/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2003/44] | C08F8/00, A61L15/00, B01J20/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2018/42] |
Former [2003/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verwendung pulverförmiger, vernetzter, wässrige Flüssigkeiten sowie Blut absorbierender Polymere | [2018/33] | English: | Use of powdery, crosslinked polymers which absorb aqueous liquids and blood | [2018/33] | French: | Utilisation de polymères poudreux, réticulés, absorbant les liquides aqueux et le sang | [2018/33] |
Former [2003/44] | Pulverförmige, vernetzte, wässrige Flüssigkeiten sowie Blut absorbierende Polymere, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung | ||
Former [2003/44] | Powdery, crosslinked polymers which absorb aqueous liquids and blood, method for production thereof and their use | ||
Former [2003/44] | Polymères poudreux, réticulés, absorbant les liquides aqueux et le sang, leur procédé de production et leur utilisation | Examination procedure | 19.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 06.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 19.05.2004 | Observations by third parties | 16.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2015 | Observations by third parties | 04.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00907638.1 / EP1165631 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000907638) is 31.01.2003 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 19 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.10.2018 | CY | 17.10.2018 | DK | 17.10.2018 | ES | 17.10.2018 | FI | 17.10.2018 | IT | 17.10.2018 | MC | 17.10.2018 | NL | 17.10.2018 | SE | 17.10.2018 | GR | 18.01.2019 | PT | 17.02.2019 | GB | 26.02.2019 | IE | 26.02.2019 | LU | 26.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | [2022/30] |
Former [2021/26] | CY | 17.10.2018 | |
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
GB | 26.02.2019 | ||
IE | 26.02.2019 | ||
LU | 26.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | DK | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
GB | 26.02.2019 | ||
IE | 26.02.2019 | ||
LU | 26.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | DK | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
IE | 26.02.2019 | ||
LU | 26.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | DK | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
LU | 26.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | DK | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
LU | 26.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | DK | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | DK | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | ES | 17.10.2018 | |
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | ES | 17.10.2018 | |
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | ES | 17.10.2018 | |
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 17.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0233067 (SEKISUI PLASTICS [JP]) [Y] 1-32 * page 6, line 20 - page 7, line 24 * * page 8, line 4 - page 11, line 1 * * page 11, line 7 - page 13, line 16 * * page 17, line 15 - page 18, line 1; claims 1-12 *; | [A]EP0521355 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 34 - page 4, line 38 ** page 5, line 46 - page 6, line 14; claims 1-11 *; | [A]EP0695763 (AMCOL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 8 - line 51; claims 1-30 *; | [Y]WO9605234 (KAO CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-32 * page 9 - page 10, paragraph 2 * * page 12, paragraph 3 - page 13, paragraph 1 * * page 15, paragraph 3 - page 16, paragraph 3 * * page 17, paragraph 2 - page 18, paragraph 3 * * page 21, paragraph 2 - page 22, paragraph 5 * * page 28, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2; claims 1-16 *; | [A]EP0856528 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 2 - line 12 * * page 5, line 15 - line 30 * * page 5, line 43 - line 52; claims 1-20 *; | [Y]EP0882502 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [Y] 1-32 * page 5, line 16 - page 6, line 10 * * page 12, line 1 - line 56 * * page 13, line 3 - line 19 * * page 13, line 27 - line 54 * * page 14, line 4 - line 45; claims 1-33 *; | [Y]EP0889063 (KAO CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-32 * page 3, line 23 - line 29 * * page 8, line 14 - line 48; claims 1-8 * | other | US5599335 |