EP1388762 - Black toner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2004/07] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugahara, Nobuyoshi c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kohtaki, Takaaki c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ichikawa, Yasuhiro c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Ida, Tetsuya c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Hayami, Kazuhiko c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Komatsu, Nozomu c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2004/07] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/07] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03017184.7 | 29.07.2003 | [2004/07] | Priority number, date | JP20020220975 | 30.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002220975 | [2004/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1388762 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1388762 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | [2004/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1388762 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/08, G03G9/087 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
G03G9/08755 (EP,US);
G03G9/0819 (EP,US);
G03G9/0821 (EP,US);
G03G9/0823 (EP,US);
G03G9/0827 (EP,US);
G03G9/08706 (EP,US);
G03G9/08708 (EP,US);
G03G9/08713 (EP,US);
G03G9/08715 (EP,US);
G03G9/08717 (EP,US);
G03G9/0872 (EP,US);
G03G9/08722 (EP,US);
G03G9/08724 (EP,US);
G03G9/08726 (EP,US);
G03G9/08728 (EP,US);
G03G9/08731 (EP,US);
G03G9/08733 (EP,US);
G03G9/08782 (EP,US);
G03G9/08795 (EP,US);
G03G9/08797 (EP,US);
G03G9/0904 (EP,US);
G03G9/09783 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/07] | G03G9/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/33] |
Former [2004/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schwarzer Toner | [2004/07] | English: | Black toner | [2004/07] | French: | Révélateur électrophotographique noir | [2004/07] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/07] | 16.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/39] | IT | 03.05.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1069479 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 1,4,9,10,25 *; | [A]EP1205810 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1* claims 1-10,18 * |