EP1387361 - Semiconductor memory device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [2015/19] |
Former [2012/07] | For all designated states Intellectual Properties I Kft. Arpad ut 48-50, I / 5 1042 Budapest / HU | ||
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anzai, Shinsuke 906 Raporutenri, 2613-1, Ichinomotocho Tenri-shi, Nara 632-0004 / JP | 02 /
Mori, Yasumichi 635-1-502, Tsujimachi Ikoma-shi, Nara 630-0212 / JP | 03 /
Tanaka, Hidehiko 4-360-9, Minamikyoubatecho Nara-shi, Nara 630-8141 / JP | [2004/06] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstraße 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | Weller, Erich W. Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2004/06] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03017195.3 | 29.07.2003 | [2004/06] | Priority number, date | JP20020221145 | 30.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002221145 | JP20030148335 | 26.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003148335 | [2004/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1387361 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1387361 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G11C29/00, G11C11/56, G11C11/00 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
G11C11/5642 (EP,US);
G11C16/00 (KR);
G11C16/28 (EP,US);
G11C2211/5623 (EP,US);
G11C2211/5641 (EP,US);
G11C29/70 (EP,US);
G11C7/06 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/06] | G11C11/56, G11C29/00, G11C11/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2006/34] |
Former [2004/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Halbleiterspeicheranordnung | [2004/06] | English: | Semiconductor memory device | [2004/06] | French: | Dispositif de mémoire à semiconducteurs | [2004/06] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/20] | 15.06.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.10.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/27] | 28.06.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.07.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.07.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.07.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5438546 (ISHAC MICHEL I [US], et al) [Y] 6,7 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 43 *; | [A]WO9534074 (INTEL CORP [US]) [A] 1-4 * page 14, paragraph L - page 18, paragraph 3; figure 5 *; | [XY]EP0961287 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1-6 * [Y] 5-7; | [X]US6052303 (CHEVALLIER CHRISTOPHE J [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 12, line 17 - column 15, line 47; figures 7-9 *; | [Y]EP1058192 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 5-7 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0055] *; | [Y]US6307787 (AL-SHAMMA ALI K [US], et al) [Y] 5 * column 10, line 25 - column 14, line 10 *; | [X]EP1193715 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0025]; figure 4 *; | [A]US6418052 (SHIBATA NOBORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-5* column 28, line 34 - column 34, line 9; figures 27-33 *; | [Y] - BURSKY D, "FEATURE-RICH FLASH MEMORIES DELIVER HIGH DENSITY WITH A WIDE VARIETY OF FEATURES AND DENSITIES OF UP TO 128 MBITS/CHIP, NOR-STYLE FLASH MEMORIES SATISFY MANY SYSTEM NEEDS", ELECTRONIC DESIGN, PENTON MEDIA, CLEVELAND, OH, US, (19990809), vol. 47, no. 16, ISSN 0013-4872, pages 67,68 - 70,71,72, XP000920169 [Y] 6,7 * page 71, column L, paragraph L - page 72, column L, paragraph 2; figures 2,3 * | Examination | WO9534074 | EP0788113 | US6137719 | US2002036925 |