EP1358800 - Anti-microbial aerosol compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clarkson, Dagmar Katrin Unilever R&D Port Sunlight, Quarry Road East Bebington, Wirral, Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 02 /
Landa, Sjaak Andrew Unilever R&D Port Sunlight, Quarry Road East Bebington, Wirral, Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 03 /
Coxon, Charles Andrew Unilever R&D Port Sunlight, Quarry Road East Bebington, Wirral, Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 04 /
Makin, Anthony Stephen 37 Mount Pleasant Close Lightwater, Surrey, JU18 5TR / GB | 05 /
Volker, Axel Elida Pond s, Descartes 4020 B1667AYN Tortuguitas, Buenos Aires / AR | 06 /
Winchell, Harry Saul - deceased / US | [2009/37] |
Former [2003/45] | 01 /
Clarkson, Dagmar Katrin Unilever R&D Port Sunlight, Quarry Road East Bebington, Wirral, Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | ||
02 /
Landa, Sjaak Andrew Unilever R&D Port Sunlight, Quarry Road East Bebington, Wirral, Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | |||
03 /
Coxon, Charles Andrew Unilever R&D Port Sunlight, Quarry Road East Bebington, Wirral, Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | |||
04 /
Makin, Anthony Stephen 37 Mount Pleasant Close Lightwater, Surrey, JU18 5TR / GB | |||
05 /
Volker, Axel Elida Pond s, Descartes 4020 B1667AYN Tortuguitas, Buenos Aires / AR | Representative(s) | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/03] | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2003/45] | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever PLC Patent Department, Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03017341.3 | 08.01.2001 | [2003/45] | Priority number, date | GB20000001129 | 18.01.2000 Original published format: GB 0001129 | [2003/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1358800 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01N37/44, A01N25/06, A61K7/32, A61K7/48 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
A61Q17/005 (EP,US);
A01N37/44 (EP,US);
A61K8/046 (EP,US);
A61K8/34 (EP,US);
A61K8/345 (EP,US);
A61K8/41 (EP,US);
A61K8/416 (EP,US);
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61Q15/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A01N37/44, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N37/44, A01N25/06, A01N25/02 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/45] | Title | German: | Antimikrobielle Aerosolzusammensetzungen | [2003/45] | English: | Anti-microbial aerosol compositions | [2003/45] | French: | compositions antimicrobiennes sous forme d'aérosol | [2003/45] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 11.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/47] | 30.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/47] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01900393.8 / EP1248520 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 28.04.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 28.04.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.05.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]GB1420946 (BEECHAM GROUP LTD) [XD] 1-6,10,13,14,16-19,21-25 * page 2, line 2 - line 4 * * page 2, line 50 - line 54; example 8 *; | [A]US3998967 (WEIL EDWARD D) [A] 1,3,4,7,8,24,25* column 1, line 16 - column 2, line 48 *; | [AD]US4356190 (KRASKIN KENNETH S) [AD] 1-26 * column 2, line 30 - column 4, line 52 * * column 6, line 1 - line 38; examples VIII,IX,XI,XVIII,XIX,XXIII,XXIV *; | [XD]WO9744006 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [XD] 1-4,9,13,16,21-25 * page 1 - page 3, paragraph 3 * * page 5, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * * page 6, paragraph 2; example 1 * |