EP1434008 - Cooking chamber assembly in microwave oven [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong,Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | [2015/09] |
Former [2004/27] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong,Youngdungpo-Gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Sang Ryul 204-901, Dong-a 2nd Apt. Woryeong-dong Happo-gu Masan-si, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | 02 /
Lee, Duck Gil H-324, LG Electronics Dormitory Gaumjung-dong Changwon-si, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | [2015/09] |
Former [2004/27] | 01 /
Lee, Sang Ryul 204-901, Dong-a 2nd Apt., Woryeong-dong, Happo-gu Masan-si, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | ||
02 /
Lee, Duck Gil H-324, LG Electronics Dormitory, Gaumjung-dong Changwon-si, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/09] | Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/27] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03017400.7 | 31.07.2003 | [2004/27] | Priority number, date | KR20020085106 | 27.12.2002 Original published format: KR 2002085106 | KR20020086907 | 30.12.2002 Original published format: KR 2002086907 | [2004/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1434008 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1434008 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | [2011/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1434008 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F24C7/02, F24C15/08, F24C15/16, F24C15/20, H05B6/64 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
H05B6/6426 (EP,US);
H05B6/6408 (EP,US);
H05B6/642 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/27] | F24C7/02, F24C15/08, F24C15/16, F24C15/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/27] | Title | German: | Garraumanordnung in einem Mikrowellenofen | [2004/27] | English: | Cooking chamber assembly in microwave oven | [2004/27] | French: | Assemblage d'un chambre de cuisinière dans un four à microondes | [2004/27] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 29.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2003 | AT | 25.02.2015 | BE | 25.02.2015 | BG | 25.02.2015 | CY | 25.02.2015 | CZ | 25.02.2015 | DK | 25.02.2015 | EE | 25.02.2015 | ES | 25.02.2015 | FI | 25.02.2015 | IT | 25.02.2015 | MC | 25.02.2015 | NL | 25.02.2015 | PT | 25.02.2015 | RO | 25.02.2015 | SE | 25.02.2015 | SI | 25.02.2015 | SK | 25.02.2015 | TR | 25.02.2015 | GR | 26.05.2015 | CH | 31.07.2015 | FR | 31.07.2015 | GB | 31.07.2015 | IE | 31.07.2015 | LI | 31.07.2015 | LU | 31.07.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 31.07.2003 | |
AT | 25.02.2015 | ||
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
GB | 31.07.2015 | ||
IE | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
LU | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
GB | 31.07.2015 | ||
IE | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
LU | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
GB | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
LU | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
GB | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
LU | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
GB | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
LU | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
LU | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/15] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
LU | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 25.02.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4421968 (OSEPCHUK JOHN M [US]) [X] 10 * the whole document *[A] 11,12; | [X]US4556772 (MCCAMMON PATRICK R [US], et al) [X] 10-19 * the whole document *; | [X]JPS61186729 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]EP0352622 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]JP2000154920 (SHARP KK) [X] 1-9 * abstract * |