EP1503310 - Computer-implemented method and system to support in developing a process specification for a collaborative process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAP AG Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | [2005/38] |
Former [2005/05] | For all designated states SAP Aktiengesellschaft Neurottstrasse 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kraft, Frank Michael Nachtigallenweg 45 67346 Speyer / DE | [2005/05] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/05] | Schmidt, Steffen J., Dipl.-Ing. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03017471.8 | 01.08.2003 | [2005/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1503310 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60, H04L29/06 | [2005/05] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
H04L67/10 (EP,US);
H04L67/30 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99943 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/42] |
Former [2005/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rechnerimplementiertes Verfahren und System zur Unterstützung bei der Entwicklung einer Prozessspezifikation für einen kollaborativen Prozess | [2005/05] | English: | Computer-implemented method and system to support in developing a process specification for a collaborative process | [2005/05] | French: | Procédé implémenté par ordinateur et système pour supporter le développement d'une spécification de processus collaboratif | [2005/05] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 03.08.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.11.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.02.2009 | 03.02.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.02.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.02.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/29] | 05.03.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.09.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4694422 (KAKUDA YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 1, line 5 - line 62 * * column 2, line 25 - column 4, line 19 * * column 5, line 5 - line 30 * * figures 4A,B *; | [X]US5655075 (SAITO HIRONORI [JP], et al) [X] 1-13 * column 1, line 5 - column 3, line 14 * * column 5, line 18 - column 6, line 18 * * column 8, line 1 - line 56 * * column 13, line 10 - column 16, line 17 * * column 22, line 13 - column 23, line 5 *; | [X] - YUANG M C, "Survey of protocol verification techniques based on finite state machine models", COMPUTER NETWORKING SYMPOSIUM, 1988., PROCEEDINGS OF THE WASHINGTON, DC, USA 11-13 APRIL 1988, WASHINGTON, DC, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC. PR, US, (19880411), ISBN 0-8186-0835-8, pages 164 - 172, XP010011847 [X] 1-13 * page 164, paragraph 1 * * page 165, paragraph 2.2 - paragraph 2.3 * * page 166, paragraph 4.1 - paragraph 4.3 * * page 167, paragraph 5 - paragraph 5.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CNS.1988.4993 | [A] - KAKUDA Y ET AL, "AUTOMATED VERIFICATION OF RESPONSIVE PROTOCOLS MODELED BY EXTENDED FINITE STATE MACHINES", REAL TIME SYSTEMS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DORDRECHT, NL, (19941101), vol. 7, no. 3, ISSN 0922-6443, pages 275 - 289, XP000485229 [A] 1-13 * page 276, paragraph 2.1 - page 277, paragraph 2.2 * * page 278 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01088522 | [A] - BOSIK B S ET AL, "FINITE STATE MACHINE BASED FORMAL METHODS IN PROTOCOL CONFORMANCE TESTING: FROM THEORY TO IMPLEMENTATION", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19910801), vol. 22, no. 1, ISSN 0169-7552, pages 7 - 33, XP000224436 [A] 1-13 * page 7, paragraph 1 - page 11 * * page 12, paragraph 2.2 * * page 16, paragraph 4 - page 21, paragraph 4.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-7552(91)90079-R |