EP1364845 - Airbag inflator and airbag apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daicel Chemical Industries, Ltd. Mainichi Intecio 3-4-5, Umeda Kita-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2008/01] |
Former [2003/48] | For all designated states DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1, Teppo-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katsuta, Nobuyuki 4-2-2, Otsu-machi Otsu-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Oda, Shingo 341-11, Tsuichiba Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo / JP | 03 /
Ueda, Masayuki Daicel Chemical Ind. 3-2-5 Kasumigaseki Chiyoda-ku Toyko / JP | [2003/48] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03017478.3 | 03.04.1997 | [2003/48] | Priority number, date | JP19960085389 | 08.04.1996 Original published format: JP 8538996 | JP19960085390 | 08.04.1996 Original published format: JP 8539096 | JP19960228620 | 29.08.1996 Original published format: JP 22862096 | JP19960202460 | 31.07.1996 Original published format: JP 20246096 | JP19960202462 | 31.07.1996 Original published format: JP 20246296 | JP19960202464 | 31.07.1996 Original published format: JP 20246496 | JP19960202463 | 31.07.1996 Original published format: JP 20246396 | JP19960202461 | 31.07.1996 Original published format: JP 20246196 | JP19960290348 | 31.10.1996 Original published format: JP 29034896 | JP19960290349 | 31.10.1996 Original published format: JP 29034996 | [2003/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1364845 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1364845 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/26 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
B60R21/2644 (EP,KR,US);
B60R21/261 (KR);
B01D46/2411 (EP,KR,US);
B01D46/4263 (EP,KR,US);
B60R21/2035 (EP,KR,US);
B60R21/33 (EP,KR,US);
C06D5/06 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2275/105 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2279/10 (EP,KR,US);
B60R2021/26017 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/48] | Title | German: | Gasgenerator für eine Fahrzeugluftsackanordnung und Fahrzeugluftsackanordnung | [2003/48] | English: | Airbag inflator and airbag apparatus | [2003/48] | French: | Générateur de gaz pour coussin de sécurité gonflable et coussin de sécurité gonflable | [2003/48] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/48] | 27.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/17] | 01.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00123167.9 / EP1074437 | EP97105509.0 / EP0800964 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0476886 (NIPPON OILS & FATS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,5 * figure 8 *; | [Y]EP0509655 (MORTON INT INC [US]) [Y] 10 * page 7, line 55 - line 58 *; | [A]WO9425315 (AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LAB [US]) [A] 1,8* the whole document *; | [XY]EP0640515 (MORTON INT INC [US]) [X] 1-4,6,7,9,11,12,15 * column 6, line 28 - column 7, line 18 * [Y] 10 |