EP1361729 - User interface for a radio telephone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2016 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2015/12] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies OY Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Larsen, Flemming Klovborg Aegirsgade 28, 1 2200 Copenhagen N / DK | [2004/06] |
Former [2003/46] | 01 /
Larsen, Flemming Klovborg Dannebrogsgade 22, 4.TV 1660 Copenhagen V / DK | Representative(s) | Higgin, Paul Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [2015/22] |
Former [2010/14] | Higgin, Paul Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | ||
Former [2009/15] | Nordic Patent Service Pilestræde 58 1112 Copenhagen K / DK | ||
Former [2007/41] | van Walstijn, Bartholomeus G. G., et al Nordic Patent Service ApS Pilestraede 58 1112 Copenhagen K / DK | ||
Former [2003/46] | van Walstijn, Bartholomeus Gerard G. Walstijn Intellectual Property ApS Parkovsvej 3 2820 Gentofte / DK | Application number, filing date | 03017842.0 | 21.11.1997 | [2003/46] | Priority number, date | GB19960024520 | 22.11.1996 Original published format: GB 9624520 | [2003/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1361729 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1361729 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | [2003/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1361729 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725, H04M1/23 | [2014/37] | CPC: |
H04M1/23 (EP,US);
H04M1/72469 (EP,US);
H04M1/72466 (EP,US);
H04M1/663 (EP);
H04M1/724 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/46] | H04M1/247, H04M1/725 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2015/22] |
Former [2004/33] | DE, FR, GB, SE | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Benutzerschnittstelle für ein Funktelefon | [2003/46] | English: | User interface for a radio telephone | [2003/46] | French: | Interface d'utilisateur pour un radiotéléphone | [2003/46] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/30] | 06.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97309433.7 / EP0844778 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19970309433) is 01.07.2003 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 27.05.2015 | FR | 30.11.2015 | [2017/40] |
Former [2016/50] | FR | 30.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE4233064 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * column 1, line 46 - line 56 * * column 2, line 22 - line 58 ** figures 1,2 *; | [YA]EP0633684 (US WEST TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * * column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 5 * * column 6, line 56 - column 8, line 9 * * column 8, line 34 - column 9, line 56 * * figures 5,7-13 * [A] 4 | Examination | EP0554625 |