EP1361690 - Method and apparatus for retransmitting data packets based on channel conditions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2006 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2006/02] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Kadoma Kadoma-city, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Kadoma Kadoma-city, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hakenberg, Rolf c/o Panasonic European Lab. GmbH Monzastrasse 4c 63225 Langen / DE | 02 /
Burmeister, Carsten c/o Panasonic European Lab. GmbH Monzastrasse 4c 63225 Langen / DE | 03 /
Wiebke, Thomas c/o Panasonic European Lab. GmbH Monzastrasse 4c 63225 Langen / DE | [2003/46] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03017902.2 | 02.03.2000 | [2003/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1361690 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1361690 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | [2004/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1361690 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18, H04L29/06 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
H04L65/80 (EP,US);
H04L1/1678 (EP,US);
H04L1/1809 (EP,US);
H04L1/1854 (EP,US);
H04L1/1887 (EP,US);
H04L65/612 (EP,US);
H04L65/70 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04N19/89 (EP,US);
H04N21/2402 (EP,US);
H04N21/2404 (EP,US);
H04N21/2408 (EP,US);
H04N21/26216 (EP,US);
H04N21/44209 (EP,US);
H04N21/6375 (EP,US);
H04N21/6377 (EP,US);
H04N21/643 (EP,US);
H04N21/658 (EP,US);
H04L65/1101 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/46] | H04L1/18, H04N7/64, H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur auf Kanalzustand basierten Wiederholung von Datenpaketen | [2003/46] | English: | Method and apparatus for retransmitting data packets based on channel conditions | [2003/46] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la retransmission de paquets de données basée sur des conditions de canal | [2005/29] |
Former [2003/46] | Procédé et appareil pour la retransmission de paquets de données en base aux conditions du canal | Examination procedure | 15.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 03.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00104388.4 / EP1130839 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10126772 ; | [DX]US5768527 (ZHU QIN-FAN [US], et al) [DX] 1-12 * figures 2-6 * * column 4, line 49 - column 10, line 4 *; | [X]EP0905976 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4,6,7,10,12 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0265] - paragraph [0267] *; | [DA]US5918002 (KLEMETS ANDERS EDGAR [US], et al) [DA] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A] - ZHENG H ET AL, "QoS aware mobile video communications", MILCOM 1999. IEEE MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS. CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS (CAT. NO.99CH36341), PROCEEDINGS OF CONFERENCE ON MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS (MILCOM'99), ATLANTIC CITY, NJ, USA, 31 OCT.-3 NOV. 1999, 1999, Piscataway, NJ, USA, IEEE, USA, ISBN 0-7803-5538-5, pages 1231 - 1235 vol.2, XP002144847 [A] 1-12 * page 1232, column L, paragraph 3 - page 1234, column R, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MILCOM.1999.821400 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10126772 A 19980515 (CHOKOSOKU NETWORK COMPUTER GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO:KK) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 30, Database accession no. 1998-340200, XP002144848 [ ] * abstract * | Examination | EP1006689 | - SCHULZRINNE H. ET AL, "RTP: A Transport Protocol for Real-Time Applications", REQUEST FOR COMMENTS 1889, (199601), pages 1 - 75, XP002972120 |