EP1388604 - Electrothermic controlled locking device for an appliance door [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2010 | Change - French title | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ellenberger & Poensgen GmbH Industriestrasse 2-8 90518 Altdorf / DE | [2004/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harrer, Hubert Meckenhausen 10 91161 Hilpoltstein / DE | 02 /
Hengelein, Günter Hackenrichtstrasse 34 90518 Altdorf / DE | 03 /
Schmidt, Wolfgang Oberölsbach 62 92348 Berg / DE | [2004/07] | Representative(s) | Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 90482 Nürnberg / DE | [2004/07] | Application number, filing date | 03017945.1 | 06.08.2003 | [2004/07] | Priority number, date | DE2002136777 | 10.08.2002 Original published format: DE 10236777 | [2004/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1388604 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | D06F37/42, D06F39/14, A47L15/42, D06F49/00 | [2004/07] | CPC: |
F24C15/022 (EP,US);
A47L15/4259 (EP);
D06F49/003 (EP);
E05B47/0009 (EP);
A47L2501/22 (EP);
D06F37/42 (EP,US);
D06F39/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/45] |
Former [2004/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrothermisch gesteuerte Verriegelungsvorrichtung für eine Gerätetür | [2004/07] | English: | Electrothermic controlled locking device for an appliance door | [2004/07] | French: | Dispositiv de verrouillage à commande électrothermique pour porte d'appareil ménager | [2010/42] |
Former [2004/07] | Dispositive de verrouillage à commande éléctrothermique pour porte d'appareil ménager | Examination procedure | 12.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/22] | 09.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.09.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.09.2004 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1197488 (GEN ELECTRIC CANADA [CA]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9,10,12,13,15 * the whole document *; | [X]DE1947986 (LICENTIA GMBH) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9,10,12,13,15 * the whole document *; | [X]DE2029941 (LICENTIA GMBH) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,12,13,15* the whole document *; | [X]US4286811 (SCHANTZ SPENCER C) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9,12,13,15 * the whole document *; | [XA]DE3010124 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-8,12,13,15 * the whole document * [A] 9,10; | [X]GB2162240 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS ITALIA SPA) [X] 1-3,5,7,9,12,13,15 * the whole document *; | [X]DE4228100 (YMOS AG IND PRODUKTE [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-8,12,13,15 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19641591 (LTD LOCKING TECHNOLOGIES AND D [DE]) [X] 1-7,9,10,12,13,15 * the whole document * |