EP1388963 - Wavelength division multiplexing passive optical network system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Choi, Jun-Kook 7-1203 Jinheung Apt., Cheongdam-Dong Kangnam-Gu Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/07] | For all designated states Choi, Jun-Kook 7-1203 Jinheung Apt., Cheongdam-Dong Kangnam-Gu, Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Song, Jae-Won 607 Pyeonggwang-Dong, Dong-Gu Daegu / KR | 02 /
Lee, Jong-Hoon 595-95 Bokhyeon-1-Dong, Buk-Gu Daegu / KR | 03 /
Park, No-Wook 102-1003 Woobang-Oseong Town, Sooseong-1-ga Sooseong-Gu Daegu / KR | 04 /
Seo, Jun-Hyok 316-15 Daehyeong-Dong, Buk-Gu Daegu / KR | 05 /
Jeon, Man-Shik 102-401 Yongkye-Town, Yongkye-Dong, Dong-Gu Daegu / KR | 06 /
Jang, Suck-Woo 245, Seongnae-Dong, Youngcheon-Si Gyeongsangbuk-Do / KR | 07 /
Baek, Jang-Ki Ga-103 1-cha Mikwang 859-2 Segye-5-Ri, Ochen-Eup Nam-Gu, Pohang-Si, Gyeongsangbuk-Do / KR | [2004/07] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/07] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03017962.6 | 06.08.2003 | [2004/07] | Priority number, date | KR20020046314 | 06.08.2002 Original published format: KR 2002046314 | KR20020076191 | 03.12.2002 Original published format: KR 2002076191 | KR20020076169 | 03.12.2002 Original published format: KR 2002076169 | [2004/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1388963 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1388963 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04J14/02 | [2004/07] | CPC: |
H04J14/0283 (EP,US);
H04J14/0216 (EP,US);
H04J14/0226 (EP,US);
H04J14/0227 (EP,US);
H04J14/0246 (EP,US);
H04J14/0247 (EP,US);
H04J14/025 (EP,US);
H04J14/0252 (EP,US);
H04J14/028 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE [2007/08] |
Former [2004/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wellenlängenmultiplexübertragungssystem im passiven, optischen Netzwerk | [2004/07] | English: | Wavelength division multiplexing passive optical network system | [2004/07] | French: | Système de transmission à multiplexage en longueurs d'onde dans un réseau optique passif | [2004/07] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2003 | Examination requested [2004/07] | 10.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/34] | 03.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0295857 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]) [X] 1,5,6,8 * abstract * * page 2, line 18 - page 4, line 18 * * figures 1,2 *; | [XY]EP0615358 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * abstract * * column 1, line 16 - column 4, line 38 * * column 6, line 51 - column 8, line 1 * * column 11, line 14 - line 48 * * column 13, line 3 - line 26 * * figure 10 * [Y] 14-16; | [A]US6307986 (DUERKSEN GARY [US], et al) [A] 10-13 * column 1, line 8 - line 15 * * column 2, line 40 - line 45 * * column 3, line 55 - column 6, line 67 * * column 9, line 6 - column 11, line 31 * * figures 1A,1B,4 *; | [A]US2002039213 (DUERKSEN GARY [US]) [A] 1-9,14-16 * page 1, paragraph 3 * * page 2, paragraph 12 - paragraph 23 * * figure 1 *; | [PX]EP1263153 (REDFERN BROADBAND NETWORKS INC [US]) [PX] 10-13 * column 6, paragraph 24 - paragraph 29 * * column 10, paragraph 42 - column 12, paragraph 49 * * column 14, paragraph 57 * * figures 1a,4-6 *; | [DY] - ZHAO Y ET AL, "A NOVEL BI-DIRECTIONAL ADD/DROP MODULE FOR SINGLE FIBER BI-DIRECTIONAL SELF-HEALING WAVELENGTH DIVISION MULTIPLEXES RING NETWORKS", OFC/IOOC '99 OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION CONFERENCE / INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTEGRATED OPTICS AND OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION. SAN DIEGO, CA, FEB. 21 - 26, 1999, OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION CONFERENCE / INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTEGRATED OP, (19990221), ISBN 0-7803-5430-3, pages TUL7 - 1, XP000966861 [DY] 14-16 * the whole document * | [DA] - KIM H D ET AL, "A LOW-COST WDM SOURCE WITH AN ASE INJECTED FABRY-PEROT SEMICONDUCTOR LASER", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (200008), vol. 12, no. 8, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 1067 - 1069, XP000968561 [DA] 3,7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.868010 | [A] - ZHAO Y ET AL, "A NOVEL BIDIRECTIONAL ADD/DROP MODULE USING WAVEGUIDE GRATING ROUTERS AND WAVELENGTH CHANNEL MATCHED FIBER GRATINGS", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (199909), vol. 11, no. 9, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 1180 - 1182, XP000859996 [A] 10-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.784249 | [A] - PARK SUNG-BUM ET AL, "Bidirectional WDM self-healing ring network composed of add fibre and drop fibre", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, IEE STEVENAGE, GB, (20010329), vol. 37, no. 7, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 446 - 448, XP006016427 [A] 10-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:20010306 |